EP1328110 - A call handling device for different types of applications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2003/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Penet, Xavier 13 Avenue Jean Jaures 67400 Illkirchen-Graffenstaden / FR | 02 /
Marchesin, Armand 23 Rue Biehn 67370 Griesheim/Souffel / FR | [2003/29] | Representative(s) | Rausch, Gabriele, et al Alcatel Intellectual Property Department Stuttgart 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/29] | Rausch, Gabriele, Dr., et al Alcatel Intellectual Property Department, Stuttgart 70430 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 02360020.8 | 11.01.2002 | [2003/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1328110 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04M7/00, H04L29/06, H04Q3/00 | [2003/29] | CPC: |
H04L65/1069 (EP);
H04M7/125 (EP);
H04Q3/5455 (EP);
H04Q2213/13003 (EP);
H04Q2213/13034 (EP);
H04Q2213/1305 (EP);
H04Q2213/13093 (EP);
H04Q2213/13106 (EP);
H04Q2213/1322 (EP);
H04Q2213/13389 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/29] | Title | German: | Anrufsteuerungsgerät für veschiedene Arten von Anwendungen | [2003/29] | English: | A call handling device for different types of applications | [2003/29] | French: | Dispositif de traitement d' appel pour applications des types différents | [2003/29] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/44] | 27.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.03.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1102498 (NORTEL NETWORKS CORP [CA]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0147231 (3COM CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,7,10,14 * figure 6 * * page 25, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 28, paragraph 2 - page 29, paragraph 4 *; | [A]EP1128682 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]); | [X]US6298045 (PANG ADELINE [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 7, line 25 - line 47 * * column 8, line 15 - line 31 * * column 11, line 1 - line 54 * * column 12, line 12 - column 19 * * column 12, line 58 - column 13, line 28 * * column 33, line 42 - line 45 * * column 34, line 42 - line 49 * * figures 3-5 * |