EP1328102 - Method and system for managing the access to a communication network based on authentication data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.05.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 10.06.2009 [2009/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2003/29] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chantrain, Dominique Buizegemlei 86 2650 Edegem / BE | 02 /
Daenen, Koen Neysetterstraat 25 3150 Haacht / BE | [2003/29] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Werner Karl, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | Schmidt, Werner Karl, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2003/29] | Rausch, Gabriele, Dr., et al Alcatel Intellectual Property Department, Stuttgart 70430 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 02360027.3 | 14.01.2002 | [2003/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1328102 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2003/29] | CPC: |
H04L63/0272 (EP,US);
H04L63/08 (EP,US);
H04L63/0838 (EP,US);
H04L63/10 (EP,US);
H04L63/102 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/29] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zum Verwalten des Zugriffs auf ein Kommunikations-Netzwerk basierend auf Beglaubigungs-Daten | [2003/29] | English: | Method and system for managing the access to a communication network based on authentication data | [2003/29] | French: | Procédé et système de gestion d' accès à un reseau de communication basée aux données d' authentification | [2003/29] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/29] | 25.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/24] | 02.12.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/24] | 28.01.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6044401 (HARVEY JOHN PAUL [US]) [A] 2,3,9* column 3, line 21 - column 4, line 12; figure 2 *; | [X]EP1104142 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraphs [0060] , [0065] * * figure 4 *; | [A]WO0184768 (AUTHENEX INC [US], et al) [A] 1,8 * page 4, line 13 - line 21 * |