EP1365531 - Method of phase controlling of a data signal, counterpropagating clock circuit arrangement and interface device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2003/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herb, Andreas Obere Burghalde 26 71229 Leonberg / DE | 02 /
Mittrich, Martin Schubertstr. 8/1 75242 Neuhausen / DE | [2003/48] | Representative(s) | Rausch, Gabriele, et al Alcatel Intellectual Property Department Stuttgart 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | Rausch, Gabriele, Dr., et al Alcatel Intellectual Property Department, Stuttgart 70430 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 02360143.8 | 02.05.2002 | [2003/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1365531 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1365531 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/06 | [2003/48] | CPC: |
H04L7/0008 (EP,US);
H04J3/0676 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Phasenkontrolle eines Datensignales, Schaltungsanordnung für gegenläufigem Takt und Interface-Vorrichtung | [2003/48] | English: | Method of phase controlling of a data signal, counterpropagating clock circuit arrangement and interface device | [2003/48] | French: | Méthode pour contrôler un signal de données, configuration de circuit avec un horloge a propagation opposéee et dispositif d'interface | [2003/48] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/48] | 04.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.10.2004 | BE | 06.10.2004 | CH | 06.10.2004 | FI | 06.10.2004 | LI | 06.10.2004 | NL | 06.10.2004 | TR | 06.10.2004 | DK | 06.01.2005 | GR | 06.01.2005 | SE | 06.01.2005 | ES | 17.01.2005 | PT | 06.03.2005 | CY | 02.05.2005 | IE | 02.05.2005 | LU | 02.05.2005 | MC | 31.05.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/27] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
BE | 06.10.2004 | ||
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
NL | 06.10.2004 | ||
TR | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
SE | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
CY | 02.05.2005 | ||
IE | 02.05.2005 | ||
LU | 02.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
BE | 06.10.2004 | ||
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
NL | 06.10.2004 | ||
TR | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
SE | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
CY | 02.05.2005 | ||
IE | 02.05.2005 | ||
LU | 02.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
BE | 06.10.2004 | ||
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
NL | 06.10.2004 | ||
TR | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
SE | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
CY | 02.05.2005 | ||
IE | 02.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
BE | 06.10.2004 | ||
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
NL | 06.10.2004 | ||
TR | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
SE | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
IE | 02.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
BE | 06.10.2004 | ||
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
NL | 06.10.2004 | ||
TR | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
IE | 02.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
BE | 06.10.2004 | ||
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
NL | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
IE | 02.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
BE | 06.10.2004 | ||
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
NL | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
BE | 06.10.2004 | ||
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | CH | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 06.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0642238 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * figures 2,3,8,9 * * column 2, line 16 - column 2, line 31 *; | [E]US2002110212 (LYSDAL HENNING [DK], et al) [E] 1-9 * abstract * * figures 1,4 * * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 1, paragraph 13 * * page 1, paragraph 15 - page 2, paragraph 19 ** page 3, paragraph 24 - page 3, paragraph 26 *; | [A] - ALEXANDER P ET AL, "Troposcatter link characterization for network synchronization applications", NTC '77 CONFERENCE RECORD, LOS ANGELES, CA, USA, 5-7 DEC. 1977, 1977, New York, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, pages 38:4/1 - 5, XP002219998 [A] 1-9 * page 1, column 2, paragraph 2 * * figure 2 * |