EP1376896 - Iterative channel estimation for receiving wireless transmissions using multiple antennas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3 avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/35] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Evolium S.A.S. 12, rue de la Baume 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Braun, Volker Christophstrasse 13 70178 Stuttgart / DE | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2004/01] | KOHLER SCHMID + PARTNER Patentanwälte GbR, Ruppmannstrasse 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 02360186.7 | 20.06.2002 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1376896 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/08, H04L25/02 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
H04B7/0837 (EP,US);
H04L25/0204 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Title | German: | Iterative Kanalschätzung für den Empfang von Funkübertragungen mittels mehrerer Antennen | [2004/01] | English: | Iterative channel estimation for receiving wireless transmissions using multiple antennas | [2004/01] | French: | Estimation itérative de canal pour la réception de signaux de radiodiffusion utilisant d'antennes multiples | [2004/01] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/12] | 18.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/07] | 08.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.02.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 10.04.2013 | [2013/40] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5675343 (CHAMPEAU ANDRE [FR]) [Y] 3,6 * figure 3 * * column 1 - column 2 *; | [XY]WO0120860 (FRANCE TELECOM [FR]) [X] 1,2,5,8,9 * figures 2,5 * * page 3, line 10 - line 22 * * page 11, line 15 - line 21 * * page 15, line 20 - line 26 * [Y] 3,4,6,7; | [Y]WO0209231 (WESTERN MULTIPLEX CORP [US]) [Y] 4 * page 3; figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2814011 (FRANCE TELECOM [FR]) [A] 1-9 * figure 2 * * page 1 - page 2 * * page 6 - page 7 ** page 15 *; | [Y] - SIALA M ET AL, "ITERATIVE RAKE RECEIVER WITH MAP CHANNEL ESTIMATION FOR DS-CDMA SYSTEMS", ANNALES DES TELECOMMUNICATIONS - ANNALS OF TELECOMMUNICATIONS, PRESSES POLYTECHNIQUES ET UNIVERSITAIRES ROMANDES, LAUSANNE, CH, (199903), vol. 54, no. 3/4, ISSN 0003-4347, pages 243 - 254, XP000834647 [Y] 7 * abstract * |