EP1273745 - Device for preventing lifting of a sliding wing of a door, window or similar [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ferco International Ferrures et Serrures de Bâtiment Société par actions simplifiée 2, rue du Vieux-Moulin, Reding 57400 Sarrebourg / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | For all designated states Ferco International Ferrures et Serrures de Bâtiment Société par actions simplifiée 2, rue du Vieux-Moulin, Reding 57400 Sarrebourg / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alvarez, Eric 9, rue Gallo Romaine 57800 Hommert / FR | [2003/02] | Representative(s) | Rhein, Alain Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon 4A, rue de l'Industrie 67450 Mundolsheim / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | Rhein, Alain Cabinet Bleger-Rhein 8, Avenue Pierre Mendès France 67300 Schiltigheim / FR | Application number, filing date | 02360201.4 | 05.07.2002 | [2003/02] | Priority number, date | FR20010009003 | 06.07.2001 Original published format: FR 0109003 | FR20010010314 | 01.08.2001 Original published format: FR 0110314 | [2003/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1273745 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1273745 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | [2003/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/08, E05C1/00 | [2003/02] | CPC: |
E05B65/0864 (EP);
E05C1/002 (EP);
E05B17/0041 (EP);
E05B63/0004 (EP);
E05B63/042 (EP);
E05C2007/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, IT [2004/36] |
Former [2003/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Antihebungsvorrichtung für einen verschiebbaren Flügel einer Tür, eines Fensters od. dgl | [2003/02] | English: | Device for preventing lifting of a sliding wing of a door, window or similar | [2003/02] | French: | Dispositif d'anti-soulèvement pour vantail coulissant de porte, fenêtre ou analogue | [2003/02] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 12.06.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.10.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | 20.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/31] | 11.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.07.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB153807 (HERMAN REINL) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 11; | [A]US1389709 (MORRIS SUBBER) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [A]US1884484 (JOHN YACOMIS) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2062176 (HENNIGAN CHARLES E) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2107479 (HINDERER WALTER F, et al) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2322815 (BOCK FRED H) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [A]US3768847 (BUCK E, et al) [A] 1,11 * column W *; | [A]US4102545 (JAY MELVIN C) [A] 1,11* column W * |