EP1323558 - Powered closing unit of an opening of a vehicle and corresponding vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wagon SAS Parc d'Activité du Moulin Jacquet Zone 2 5-7, rue du Moulin Jacquet 79300 Bressuire / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states WAGON SAS Parc d'Activité du Moulin Jacquet Zone 2 5-7, rue du Moulin Jacquet 79300 Bressuire / FR | ||
Former [2004/33] | For all designated states WAGON SAS Parc d'Activité du Moulin Jacquet Zonen 2 5-7, rue du Moulin Jacquet 79300 Bressuire / FR | ||
Former [2003/27] | For all designated states WAGON AUTOMOTIVE SNC Route de Poitiers, Zone Industrielle No. 2, BP 59 79302 Bressuire Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maltaverne, Guy 24, Boulevard Alexandre 1 er 79300 Bressuire / FR | [2003/27] | Representative(s) | Vidon, Patrice Cabinet Vidon Technopole Atalante 16B Rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Vidon, Patrice Cabinet Vidon Technopole Atalante 16B Rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | ||
Former [2003/27] | Vidon, Patrice Le Nobel, 2, allée Antoine Becquerel BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | Application number, filing date | 02364047.7 | 10.12.2002 | [2003/27] | Priority number, date | FR20010015951 | 10.12.2001 Original published format: FR 0115951 | [2003/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1323558 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1323558 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60J1/16 | [2003/27] | CPC: |
B60J1/16 (EP,US);
E05F11/525 (EP,US);
E05F11/535 (EP,US);
E05F15/652 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/55 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2004/13] |
Former [2003/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Motorisch betriebene Schliesseinrichtung einer Öffnung in einem Fahrzeug und zugehöriges Fahrzeug | [2003/27] | English: | Powered closing unit of an opening of a vehicle and corresponding vehicle | [2003/27] | French: | Dispositif motorisé d'obturation d'une baie ménagée dans un véhicule automobile, et véhicule correspondant | [2003/27] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/49] | 03.01.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.08.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.05.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10211817 ; | [A]JPH092062 ; | [A]JP2000043565 ; | [A]US5531046 (KOLLAR CRAIG A [US], et al) [A] 1,23* figures 1-15 *; | [A]US5724769 (CRIPE TODD E [US], et al) [A] 1,23 * figures 1-12 *; | [A]US5822922 (GRUMM DARREN M [US], et al) [A] 1,23 * figures 1-15 *; | [A]EP0962346 (WAGON AUTOMOTIVE SNC [FR]) [A] 1-8 * figures 1-4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10211817 A 19980811 (NISSAN SHATAI CO LTD) [A] 1-4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970530), vol. 1997, no. 05, & JP09002062 A 19970107 (AICHI MACH IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000914), vol. 2000, no. 05, & JP2000043565 A 20000215 (AICHI MACH IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |