EP1227058 - Dosing spout for mounting on a container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2005 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lindberg & Jensen ApS Ledreborg Allé 28 4000 Roskilde / DK | [2004/32] |
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states Lindberg & Jensen ApS Industrievej 40 4000 Roskilde / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jensen, Bjoern Slot Bramsensvej 4 4600 Koege / DK | 02 /
Lindberg, Frank Blaahusvej 39 2670 Greve / DK | 03 /
Lindberg, Peter Jens Kristiansvej 11 2670 Greve / DK | [2002/51] |
Former [2002/31] | 01 /
Jensen, Bjoern Slot Bramsensvej 4 4600 Koege / DK | ||
02 /
Lindberg, Franke Blaahusvej 39 2670 Greve / DK | |||
03 /
Lindberg, Peter Jens Kristiansvej 11 2670 Greve / DK | Representative(s) | Olsen, Lau Lund, et al Internationalt Patent-Bureau A/S Hoeje Taastrup Boulevard 23 2630 Taastrup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | Olsen, Lau Lund (DK), et al Internationalt Patent-Bureau A/S, Hoeje Taastrup Boulevard 23 DK-2630 Taastrup / DK | Application number, filing date | 02388008.1 | 23.01.2002 | [2002/31] | Priority number, date | DK20010000124 | 24.01.2001 Original published format: DK 200100124 | [2002/31] | Filing language | DA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1227058 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1227058 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1227058 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B67D3/00 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
B67D3/0003 (EP,US);
B67D3/0041 (EP,US);
B67D3/0051 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/31] | Title | German: | Dosiervorrichtung für einen Behälter | [2002/31] | English: | Dosing spout for mounting on a container | [2002/31] | French: | Dispositif de dosage pour conteneurs | [2002/31] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 05.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.09.2004 | FI | 01.09.2004 | IT | 01.09.2004 | TR | 01.09.2004 | GR | 01.12.2004 | SE | 01.12.2004 | ES | 12.12.2004 | CY | 23.01.2005 | LU | 23.01.2005 | MC | 31.01.2005 | PT | 01.02.2005 | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/38] | AT | 01.09.2004 | |
FI | 01.09.2004 | ||
IT | 01.09.2004 | ||
TR | 01.09.2004 | ||
GR | 01.12.2004 | ||
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
ES | 12.12.2004 | ||
CY | 23.01.2005 | ||
LU | 23.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 01.09.2004 | |
FI | 01.09.2004 | ||
TR | 01.09.2004 | ||
GR | 01.12.2004 | ||
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
ES | 12.12.2004 | ||
CY | 23.01.2005 | ||
LU | 23.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 01.09.2004 | |
FI | 01.09.2004 | ||
TR | 01.09.2004 | ||
GR | 01.12.2004 | ||
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
ES | 12.12.2004 | ||
LU | 23.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 01.09.2004 | |
FI | 01.09.2004 | ||
TR | 01.09.2004 | ||
GR | 01.12.2004 | ||
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
ES | 12.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 01.09.2004 | |
FI | 01.09.2004 | ||
GR | 01.12.2004 | ||
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
ES | 12.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | AT | 01.09.2004 | |
FI | 01.09.2004 | ||
GR | 01.12.2004 | ||
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
ES | 12.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 01.09.2004 | |
FI | 01.09.2004 | ||
GR | 01.12.2004 | ||
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 01.09.2004 | |
FI | 01.09.2004 | ||
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 01.09.2004 | |
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 01.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3920149 (FORTINO FRANK J, et al) [Y] 13-15 * column 8, line 55 - line 68 * * column 13, line 36 - column 14, line 20; figures 1,6-8 *; | [A]DE9303504U (ATHANASSIADIS, GEORGIOS); | [XY]DE20007149U (GIRLINGER JOHANN [AT]) [X] 1,4,8 * page 9, line 22 - page 11, line 8; figures 3-8 * [Y] 13-15; | [A]DE20007148U (GIRLINGER JOHANN [AT]) | by applicant | US5702032 | AT405276B |