EP1339262 - A driver for at least three electrical loads, especially for electroluminescent light sources [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.10.2006 [2006/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2003/35] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andersson, Hakan Silvervägen 17 246 36 Löddeköpinge / SE | [2004/21] |
Former [2003/35] | 01 /
Andersson, Hakan Ö. Promenaden 1 B 21128 Malmö / SE | Representative(s) | Boesen, Johnny Peder, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2003/35] | Boesen, Johnny Peder, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 02388016.4 | 26.02.2002 | [2003/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1339262 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08 | [2003/35] | CPC: |
H05B44/00 (EP,US);
Y02B20/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/35] | Title | German: | Treiber für mindestens drei elektrische Lasten, insbesondere für Elektrolumineszenzlichtquellen | [2003/35] | English: | A driver for at least three electrical loads, especially for electroluminescent light sources | [2003/35] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation pour au moins trois charges électriques, notamment de sources lumineuses électroluminescentes | [2003/35] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 14.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/42] | 01.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0516379 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 15-18 * figure 2 *; | [A]US5899553 (HOWELL MONTGOMERY BROOK [US]) [A] * column W *; | [A]US6198405 (ANDERSSON HAAKAN [SE], et al) [A] 1-18 * column W *; | [A]US2002014862 (FREGOSO GILBERT [US]) [A] * column W * |