EP1318242 - a quick hitch coupler for coupling an accessory to a dipper arm and the quick hitch coupler comprising a control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/24] | A coupler for coupling an accessory to a dipper arm and a control system for such a coupler | ||
[2006/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2007 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geith Patents Limited Grangegeeth Slane Co. Meath / IE | [2006/41] |
Former [2003/24] | For all designated states Geith Patents Limited Grangegeeth Slane, Co. Meath / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cunningham, Bartholomew 8 Athlumney Village Navan, Co. Meath / IE | 02 /
Barron, James Glassallen Collen, Co. Louth / IE | 03 /
McKeown, Anthony 43 Oaklawns Drogheda, Co. Louth / IE | 04 /
De Courcey, Thomas Martin Oriel Road Collon, Co. Louth / IE | [2003/24] | Representative(s) | Lane, Cathal Michael, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Lane, Cathal Michael, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | ||
Former [2003/24] | Lane, Cathal Michael, et al c/o Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 02394114.9 | 06.12.2002 | [2003/24] | Priority number, date | IE20010001047 | 06.12.2001 Original published format: IE 20011047 | IE20020000341 | 03.05.2002 Original published format: IE 20020341 | [2003/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1318242 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1318242 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | [2003/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1318242 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E02F3/36 | [2003/24] | CPC: |
E02F3/3618 (EP,US);
E02F3/3622 (EP,US);
E02F3/3627 (EP,US);
E02F3/365 (EP,US);
E02F3/3663 (EP,US);
E02F9/2292 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2006/41] |
Former [2003/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Werkzeugschnellkupplung zum Kuppeln eines Anbauteils an einen Baggerarm und die Werkzeugschnellkupplung umfassend ein Steuerungssystem | [2006/11] | English: | a quick hitch coupler for coupling an accessory to a dipper arm and the quick hitch coupler comprising a control system | [2006/11] | French: | Attache rapide pour accoupler un accessoire à un bras de godet et un tel attache rapide comprenant un système de commande | [2006/11] |
Former [2003/24] | Koppler zur Kopplung eines Zubehörs an einem Baggerarm und Steuerungssystem für solch einen Koppler | ||
Former [2003/24] | A coupler for coupling an accessory to a dipper arm and a control system for such a coupler | ||
Former [2003/24] | Coupleur pour accoupler un accessoire à un bras de godet et système de commande pour un tel coupleur | Examination procedure | 05.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 08.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2005 | Observations by third parties | 06.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2006 | Observations by third parties | 07.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | EP05028014.8 / EP1637659 | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.10.2006 | CH | 11.10.2006 | CY | 11.10.2006 | EE | 11.10.2006 | FI | 11.10.2006 | LI | 11.10.2006 | NL | 11.10.2006 | SK | 11.10.2006 | LU | 06.12.2006 | MC | 31.12.2006 | BG | 11.01.2007 | DK | 11.01.2007 | SE | 11.01.2007 | GR | 12.01.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
EE | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
LU | 06.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
EE | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 11.10.2006 | |
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | NL | 11.10.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06264466 ; | [YA]US3654833 (GRIFFITHS THOMAS C) [Y] 22,29 * abstract * * column 2, line 41 - line 60 * [A] 23,24,34; | [A]US5692325 (KUZUTANI KAZUTERU [JP]); | [A]GB2332417 (REDROCK ENG LTD [GB]); | [A]WO9942670 (VERACHTERT A P METAALFAB [NL], et al) [A] 1,4-8,13,14,16,17,19,52-54 * figures 6,7 * * page 5, line 25 - page 6, line 24 *; | [YA]FR2776316 (MAILLEUX SA [FR]) [Y] 22,29 * abstract * * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 17 * * page 4, line 31 - page 5, line 4 * * page 5, line 6 - line 34 * [A] 23,28,29,34,44-51,55,58; | [A]GB2335649 (CATERPILLAR INC [US]); | [PXA]DE20119092U (NAGLER JUERGEN [DE]) [PX] 1 * abstract * * figures 2-4 * * page 6 - page 8 * [A] 2,4,5,7,9,10,13,14,16-19,52-54 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941219), vol. 018, no. 671, Database accession no. (M - 1726), & JP06264466 A 19940920 (SHIN CATERPILLAR MITSUBISHI LTD) [A] 1-7,9,10,13,14,16-19,52-54 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0007] * * claim 8 * | other | - Computer drawing dated 28th November 2001 sent by NADO GmbH to potential purchasers of the coupler disclosed in DE 201 19 902 U in November 2001., XP002991490 |