EP1241143 - Method and apparatus for heating glass panels in a tempering furnace equipped with rollers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tamglass Ltd. Oy Vehmaistenkatu 5 33730 Tampere / FI | [2006/33] |
Former [2002/38] | For all designated states Tamglass Ltd Oy Vehmaistenkatu 5 33730 Tampere / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vitkala, Jorma Lepikönkatu 27 33820 Tampere / FI | [2002/38] | Representative(s) | LEITZINGER OY Tammasaarenkatu 1 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | LEITZINGER OY Tammasaarenkatu 1 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 02396022.2 | 20.02.2002 | [2002/38] | Priority number, date | FI20010000528 | 16.03.2001 Original published format: FI 20010528 | [2002/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1241143 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1241143 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | [2004/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1241143 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C03B29/08 | [2002/38] | CPC: |
C03B29/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/38] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Erwärmen von Glasplatten in einem mit Rollen versehenen Temperofen | [2002/38] | English: | Method and apparatus for heating glass panels in a tempering furnace equipped with rollers | [2002/38] | French: | Méthode et appareil utilisés pour le chauffage de panneaux de verre dans un four à trempe à rouleaux | [2002/38] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 17.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 16.08.2006 | CY | 16.08.2006 | NL | 16.08.2006 | DK | 16.11.2006 | LU | 20.02.2007 | MC | 28.02.2007 | [2009/38] |
Former [2008/04] | BE | 16.08.2006 | |
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | BE | 16.08.2006 | |
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | BE | 16.08.2006 | |
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | BE | 16.08.2006 | |
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | NL | 16.08.2006 | |
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | NL | 16.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4505671 (MCMASTER HAROLD A [US]) [DA] 1-14* the whole document *; | [DA]US5951734 (FRIEDEL KENNETH [US], et al) [DA] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1298096 (TAMGLASS LTD OY [FI]) [E] 1-14 * the whole document * |