EP1351012 - Supporting frame for work light [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alliance Technology Group, Inc. 8F, No. 270, Sec, 4, Chung Hsiao E. Road Taipei / TW | [2003/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chuang, Feng-Chi 8F, No. 270, Sec. 4, Chung Hsiao E. Road Taipei / TW | [2003/41] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02400023.4 | 02.04.2002 | [2003/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1351012 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16M11/28, F21V21/22, F16B7/14 | [2003/41] | CPC: |
F16M11/28 (EP);
F16B7/1418 (EP);
F16B7/1454 (EP);
F16M11/10 (EP);
F16M11/2014 (EP);
F16M11/242 (EP);
F16M11/32 (EP);
F21V21/22 (EP);
F16M2200/027 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/41] | Title | German: | Tragvorrichtung für Arbeitsleuchte | [2003/41] | English: | Supporting frame for work light | [2003/41] | French: | Dispositif de support pour éclairage de travail | [2003/41] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/41] | 03.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/51] | 20.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1370176 (DENDENE ROBERT) [A] 1,2,9,10* the whole document *; | [A]US4497092 (HOSHINO YOSHIHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-4,8-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE9316598U (SHEN WEI HONG [TW]) [Y] 1-5,8,9 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE29520042U (BRAUN ANDREAS [DE]) [Y] 1-10,16 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0822346 (PRONZATI LORENZO [IT]) [Y] 1-5,8,9 * the whole document *; | [Y]GB2364739 (FAR GREAT PLASTICS IND CO LTD [TW]) [Y] 1-10,16 * the whole document * |