EP1338688 - Thread clamp for a carrier thread gripper in a rapier loom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2019 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GIVIDI-Italia S.p.A. Via Matteotti 120 20047 Brugherio / IT | [2003/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scari, Diego Armando Villaggio Brugherio 65 20047 Brugherio / IT | 02 /
Scari, Marco Villaggio Brugherio 65 20047 Brugherio / IT | [2003/35] | Representative(s) | Gaggini, Carlo Brevetti-Marchi Via ai Campi 6 6982 Agno / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/35] | Gaggini, Carlo, Dipl.Ing. Brevetti-Marchi Via ai Campi 6 6982 Agno / CH | Application number, filing date | 02405134.4 | 25.02.2002 | [2003/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1338688 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1338688 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | D03D47/23 | [2003/35] | CPC: |
D03D47/233 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/35] | Title | German: | Fadenklemme für einen Greifer in einer Greiferwebmaschine | [2003/35] | English: | Thread clamp for a carrier thread gripper in a rapier loom | [2003/35] | French: | Pince à fil pour une lance d'une machine à tisser à lances | [2003/35] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 09.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 20.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.06.2004 | 28.02.2005 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.08.2005 | 28.02.2006 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   20.11.2006 | 28.02.2007 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   28.08.2007 | 29.02.2008 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   20.08.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.10.2008 | BE | 08.10.2008 | CY | 08.10.2008 | DK | 08.10.2008 | FI | 08.10.2008 | NL | 08.10.2008 | TR | 08.10.2008 | SE | 08.01.2009 | GR | 09.01.2009 | ES | 19.01.2009 | PT | 18.02.2009 | IE | 25.02.2009 | LU | 25.02.2009 | CH | 28.02.2009 | LI | 28.02.2009 | MC | 28.02.2009 | [2019/11] |
Former [2011/43] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
CY | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
TR | 08.10.2008 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
GR | 09.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
LU | 25.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
GR | 09.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
LU | 25.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
GR | 09.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
IT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LU | 25.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
GR | 09.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
IT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LU | 25.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
GR | 09.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
IT | 25.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
GR | 09.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/42] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
BE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 19.01.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3801967 (LINAUER DORNIER GMBH) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [AD]EP0477139 (GIVIDI DI DIEGO ARMANDO SCARI [IT]) [AD] 1-12 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0894881 (GIVIDI ITALIA SPA [IT]) [A] 1-5,8-10* column 6, line 17 - line 50; figure 5 * |