EP1243963 - Variable optical attenuator using waveguide modification [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MetroPhotonics Inc. 1887 St. Joseph Blvd. Ottawa Ontario K7C 7J2 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states MetroPhotonics Inc. 1887 St. Joseph Blvd. Ottawa, Ontario K7C 7J2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
He, Jian-Jun 40 College Circle Ottawa, Ontario K1K 4R8 / CA | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | Frei, Alexandra Sarah Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | [2009/49] |
Former [2002/39] | Frei, Alexandra Sarah Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 768 8029 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 02405222.7 | 22.03.2002 | [2002/39] | Priority number, date | US20010277977P | 23.03.2001 Original published format: US 277977 P | [2002/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1243963 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1243963 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | [2004/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/01, G02F1/025 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
G02F1/025 (EP,US);
G02F1/011 (EP,US);
G02F2203/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Variabler optischer Abschwächer unter Verwendung einer Wellenleitermodifikation | [2002/39] | English: | Variable optical attenuator using waveguide modification | [2002/39] | French: | Atténuateur optique variable utilisant une modification d'un guide d'onde | [2002/39] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/16] | 08.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4145121 (HATA SUSUMU, et al) [X] 1-4,6-12,14-18 * column W *; | [Y]US5970201 (ANTHONY PHILIP JOHN [US], et al) [Y] 19-24,26-28,30 * column 2, line 5 - line 21 * * column 4, line 8 - line 26 * * column 5, line 37 - line 49; compounds 1,3 *; | [XY]GB2339028 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-4,6,7,10,18 * page 2, line 25 - line 32 * * page 3, line 17 - line 20 * * page 4, line 1 - line 9 * * page 6, line 7 - line 21 * * page 7, line 6 - line 15 * * page 9, line 3 - line 15 * * page 11, line 20 - line 32; compounds 2A,9 * [Y] 19-24,26-28,30; | [X] - VELDHUIS G J ET AL, "Integrated optic intensity modulator based on a bent channel waveguide", OPTICS COMMUNICATIONS, NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING CO. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19990915), vol. 168, no. 5-6, ISSN 0030-4018, pages 481 - 491, XP004180321 [X] 1-3 * page 482; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0030-4018(99)00392-2 |