EP1267039 - Cooling configuration for an airfoil trailing edge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2006 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.10.2006 [2006/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states Alstom Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2002/51] | For all designated states ALSTOM (Switzerland) Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5401 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liang, George 1431 S.W. Eagle Nest Way Palm City, Florida 34990 / US | [2002/51] | Application number, filing date | 02405362.1 | 03.05.2002 | [2002/51] | Priority number, date | US20010877042 | 11.06.2001 Original published format: US 877042 | [2002/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1267039 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1267039 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18 | [2002/51] | CPC: |
F01D5/187 (EP,US);
F01D5/186 (EP,US);
F05D2250/141 (EP,US);
F05D2250/241 (EP,US);
F05D2250/70 (EP,US);
F05D2260/202 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2003/37] |
Former [2002/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kühlkonstruktion für Schaufelblatthinterkante | [2002/51] | English: | Cooling configuration for an airfoil trailing edge | [2002/51] | French: | Configuration de refroidissement du bord de fuite d'une aube | [2002/51] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/29] | 16.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2763920 (TURNER JR PERCY P, et al) [Y] 5 * column 3, line 74 - column 4, line 2 *; | [DA]US4601638 (HILL EDWARD C [US], et al) [DA] 2,3 * column 5, line 20 - column 6, line 19 * * claim 1 *; | [Y]US5368441 (SYLVESTRO JOSEPH A [US], et al) [Y] 2,3 * column 6, line 55 - line 63 *; | [Y]US5378108 (ZELESKY MARK F [US]) [Y] 6,9* column 2, line 44 - line 51 *; | [Y]US5772397 (MORRIS MARK C [US], et al) [Y] 4 * column 9, line 66 - column 10, line 2 * * figure 5 *; | [XY]EP0896127 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1 * column 6, paragraph 24 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 2-6,9 |