EP1391966 - Pressure contact spring and use in power semiconductor module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.04.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2005 [2005/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [2004/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herr, Egon Kyburgstrasse 28 8037 Zürich / CH | 02 /
Assal, Jérôme Müllerstrasse 7 8004 Zürich / CH | [2004/09] | Representative(s) | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/09] | ABB Patent Attorneys c/o ABB Schweiz AG, Intellectual Property (CH-LC/IP), Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 02405706.9 | 19.08.2002 | [2004/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1391966 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01R12/04 | [2004/09] | CPC: |
H01R13/2428 (EP);
H01L24/72 (EP);
H01R12/52 (EP);
H01R13/33 (EP);
H01L23/24 (EP);
H01L2924/01004 (EP);
H01L2924/01005 (EP);
H01L2924/01013 (EP);
H01L2924/01029 (EP);
H01L2924/01079 (EP);
H01L2924/1305 (EP);
H01L2924/13055 (EP);
H01R13/5216 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/1305, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2004/47] |
Former [2004/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Druckkontaktfeder und Anwendung in Leistungshalbleitermodul | [2004/09] | English: | Pressure contact spring and use in power semiconductor module | [2004/09] | French: | Ressort de contact de pression et utilisation dans un module de semiconducteur de puissance | [2004/09] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/20] | 21.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/20] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.10.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 01.10.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5546280 (HASEBE HIRONOBU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 48 - column 11, line 65 *; | [A]US6343940 (KHOURY THEODORE A [US], et al) |