EP1398289 - Transport system for processing printed products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.05.2009 [2009/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Müller Martini Holding AG Sonnenbergstrasse 13 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [2004/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Langenegger, Daniel Bündtenweg 9a 4805 Brittnau / CH | 02 /
Schneeberger, Hansjörg Zelglistrasse 5 4805 Brittnau / CH | [2004/12] | Application number, filing date | 02405801.8 | 13.09.2002 | [2004/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1398289 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1398289 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65H33/16, B65G47/51, B42C19/00, F26B15/14 | [2004/12] | CPC: |
F26B25/003 (EP,US);
B65G47/5131 (EP,US);
F26B15/10 (EP,US);
B65H2301/42256 (EP,US);
B65H2301/4312 (EP,US);
B65H2511/13 (EP,US);
B65H2511/22 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/13, B65H2220/01 (EP,US);
B65H2511/22, B65H2220/02, B65H2220/11 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2004/50] |
Former [2004/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Förderanordnung zur Verarbeitung von Druckprodukten | [2004/12] | English: | Transport system for processing printed products | [2004/12] | French: | Système de transport pour le traitement de produits imprimés | [2004/12] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 03.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1591532 (GERBIER G.); | [A]US3911593 (COLAPINTO FABIO) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1530981 (GIAVAZZI M, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3829355 (POLYGRAPH LEIPZIG [DD]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 3 - column 4, line 25; figure - *; | [A]EP0888994 (OCE TECH BV [NL]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [X]EP0957055 (SKINETTA PAC SYST KIENER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0013]; figure - * |