Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1405679 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1405679



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 61
02.02.2005 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
03.12.2004 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
16.11.2004 Invitation to pay examination fee/designation fees with additional fee Search / examination 1
14.04.2004 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
25.02.2004 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
20.02.2004 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
27.02.2003 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
27.02.2003 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
27.02.2003 European search report Search / examination 1
27.02.2003 Supplemental sheet C (search incomplete) Search / examination 1
20.02.2003 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
17.12.2002 Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 2
11.12.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.12.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
06.12.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
27.11.2002 Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
21.11.2002 Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
11.11.2002 Invitation to appoint representative Search / examination 1
11.10.2002 Annex Search / examination 1
11.10.2002 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.10.2002 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
07.10.2002 Abstract Search / examination 1
07.10.2002 Annex Search / examination 1
07.10.2002 Claims Search / examination 2
07.10.2002 Description Search / examination 6
07.10.2002 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
07.10.2002 Drawings Search / examination 1
07.10.2002 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
03.10.2002 Annex Search / examination 1
03.10.2002 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.10.2002 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
03.10.2002 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
03.10.2002 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 10