Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP1405679


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
20.05.2005 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  06.07.2005  [2005/27]
09.03.2005 Deletion: Fee payment for extension state
09.03.2005 Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state
27.01.2005 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
01.12.2004 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
12.11.2004 Definitive list of designations published on  29.12.2004  [2004/53]
09.11.2004 New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit
09.11.2004 New entry: Period of grace R.85b EPC 1973: despatch of communication + time limit
20.02.2004 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  07.04.2004  [2004/15]