blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1405679

EP1405679 - Linear array of sonic and ultrasonic transducers, assembled in the form of complex, integral tube resonator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.05.2005
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.07.2005  [2005/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MP Interconsulting
Prokic Miodrag, Marais 36
2400 Le Locle / CH
For all designated states
Lee, Hee-Myoung
Marais 36
2400 Le Locle / CH
[2004/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Lee, Hee-Myoung, Ilsan Suntek
357, Dang Jung-dong
Kunpo-City, Kyungki-Do / KR
02 / Prokic, Miodrag
MP Interconsulting, Marais 36
2400 Le Locle / CH
 [2004/15]
Application number, filing date02405863.803.10.2002
[2004/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1405679
Date:07.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.02.2003
ClassificationIPC:B06B1/06
[2004/15]
CPC:
B06B1/0622 (EP)
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2005/01]
Former [2004/15]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Lineare Anordnung von als komplexen und integrierten Rohrresonatoren hergestellten Schall- und Ultraschallwandlern[2004/15]
English:Linear array of sonic and ultrasonic transducers, assembled in the form of complex, integral tube resonator[2004/15]
French:Réseau linéaire de transducteurs sonique ou ultrasonique, assemblé sous forme de résonateur tube complexe intégré[2004/15]
Examination procedure08.10.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/27]
02.02.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2005/27]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
16.11.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2004BG   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2004CZ   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2004DE   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2004EE   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2004FR   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2004GB   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2004SK   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
16.11.2004M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200403   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US3139603  (CHURCH DONALD R, et al);
 [Y]US3496533  (SEMMELINK ADELBERT) [Y] 1,5 * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 26 *;
 [A]US3731267  (BRANDT O, et al) [A] 2 * column 1, line 30 - line 60 *;
 [A]US5450373  (KUPISZEWSKI THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 37 - line 55 *;
 [Y]DE19724189  (BANDELIN ELECTRONIC GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 1,5 * column 1, line 24 - line 43 * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 42 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.