EP1411143 - Process for producing tubular pieces with an internal diamond coating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2008 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adamant Technologies SA Eplatures-Grise 17 2300 La Chaux-de-Fonds / CH | [2007/21] |
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states CSEM Centre Suisse d'Electronique et de Microtechnique rue Jacques-Droz 1 2007 Neuchâtel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haenni, Werner Rue du Stand, 17 2034 - Peseux / CH | 02 /
Haefke, Henry Obere Matten, 05 4431 - Bennwil / CH | [2004/17] | Representative(s) | Bovard SA Neuchâtel Rue des Noyers 11 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | GLN Rue du Puits-Godet 8a 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [2004/17] | Gresset, Jean GLN Gresset & Laesser Neuchâtel Puits-Godet 8A 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 02405877.8 | 14.10.2002 | [2004/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1411143 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1411143 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/04, C23C16/27, C23C16/01 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
C23C16/01 (EP);
B24C5/04 (EP);
C23C16/27 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2005/02] |
Former [2004/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellung von rohrförmigen Hohlkörpern mit innenseitiger Diamantbeschichtung | [2004/17] | English: | Process for producing tubular pieces with an internal diamond coating | [2004/17] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de pieces tubulaires avec revêtement interne de diamant | [2004/17] | Examination procedure | 03.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 22.10.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.02.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | 12.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.11.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0467634 (DE BEERS IND DIAMOND [ZA]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0518591 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-12 * column 3, line 25 - column 8, line 29 *; | [XY]EP0562764 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,2,7-12 * column 7, line 54 - column 8, line 50 * [Y] 3-6; | [A]DE19809675 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [DY]FR2790267 (SUISSE ELECTRONIQUE MICROTECH [CH]) [DY] 3-6 * claim - * |