EP1362954 - Milling head for a construction machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2006 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fredy Stury AG Riedgrabenstrasse 13 8153 Rümlang / CH | [2003/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stury, Fredi Im Näppenriet 6 8606 Greifensee / CH | [2003/47] | Representative(s) | Kulhavy, Sava, et al MOETTELI & Associés SARL St. Leonhardstrasse 4 9000 St. Gallen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Kulhavy, Sava, et al MOETTELI & Associés SARL St. Leonhardstrasse 4 9000 St. Gallen / CH | ||
Former [2003/47] | Kulhavy, Sava, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Sava V. Kulhavy & Co. Kornhausstrasse 3, Postfach 1138 9001 St. Gallen / CH | Application number, filing date | 02405917.2 | 28.10.2002 | [2003/47] | Priority number, date | CH20010001966 | 26.10.2001 Original published format: CH 19662001 | [2003/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1362954 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E01C23/088, E02F3/20, B28D1/18 | [2003/47] | CPC: |
E02F9/2866 (EP);
B28D1/188 (EP);
E01C23/0885 (EP);
E02F3/06 (EP);
E02F3/20 (EP);
E21B10/44 (EP);
E01C2301/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/47] | Title | German: | Fräskopf für eine Baumaschine | [2003/47] | English: | Milling head for a construction machine | [2003/47] | French: | Tête de fraisage pour un engin de chantier | [2003/47] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} | 19.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/30] | 17.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/25] | 03.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/25] | Request for further processing for: | 17.09.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 17.09.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.10.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH01256606 ; | [A]US4793732 (JORDON ROBERT L [US]) [A] 3 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4968101 (BOSSOW EMORY R [US]) [A] 9,10 * figure 1A *; | [A]US5106166 (O'NEILL MICHAEL L [US]) [A] 9 * figure - *; | [A]FR2725932 (LYON AGREGATS [FR]) [A] 9 * figures 2,4-6 *; | [X]EP0905321 (ITO CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4 * figures 1-3,8,10,11 *; | [Y]WO9963291 (TML TECHNIK GMBH TELESKOPSYSTE [DE]) [Y] 9,10 * figures 1,3-6 *; | [A]US6085446 (POSCH JUERGEN [DE]) [A] * figure 3 *; | [X]DE20017850U (KRESKEN JOSEF [DE]) [X] 1,2,6,8,10 * figure 1 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900110), vol. 014, no. 010, Database accession no. (M - 917), & JP01256606 A 19891013 (MITSUGIGAWA KENZAI:KK;OTHERS: 02) [X] 1-8 * abstract * [Y] 9,10 |