EP1319435 - Method and apparatus for introducing a first medium in a second medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2006 [2006/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Collectplan GmbH Rosenhuben, Gachnang 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | [2003/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gasser, Hermann Rosenhuben 39 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | [2003/25] | Representative(s) | Gachnang, Hans Rudolf Gachnang AG Patentanwälte Badstrasse 5 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/25] | Gachnang, Hans Rudolf Badstrasse 5 Postfach 323 8501 Frauenfeld / CH | Application number, filing date | 02406090.7 | 11.12.2002 | [2003/25] | Priority number, date | CH20010002265 | 12.12.2001 Original published format: CH 22652001 | [2003/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1319435 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1319435 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B01F5/04 | [2003/25] | CPC: |
B01F23/2131 (EP);
B01F25/3131 (EP);
B01F25/3132 (EP);
B01F25/313311 (EP);
B01F25/4316 (EP);
B01F27/74 (EP);
F24F2006/146 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | [2005/26] |
Former [2003/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Method and apparatus for introducing a first medium in a second medium | [2003/25] | English: | Method and apparatus for introducing a first medium in a second medium | [2003/25] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour introduire un premier milieu dans un second milieu | [2003/25] | Examination procedure | 07.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/09] | 29.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.05.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.05.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB694918 (F S GIBBS INC) [X] 1,2,5,6 * page 1, line 43 - line 59 * * page 2, line 81 - line 97 * * figure 1 * [A] 3,4,7-16; | [XA]DE1704754 (ZOEHREN JOSEF DIPL ING DR) [X] 1-3,6 * page 4, paragraph 3 - page 5, paragraph 1 * * figure 3 * [A] 4,5,7-16; | [XA]EP0226495 (LIQUID AIR CANADA [CA]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * page 9, paragraph 5 - paragraph 6 * * figure 1 * [A] 3,4,7-16; | [XA]DE8708201U (HANSA VENTILATOREN) [X] 1,2,5,6,14 * page 14, line 27 - page 15, line 31 * * figures 7,8 * [A] 3,4,7-13,15,16; | [XA]US5516466 (SCHLESCH RONALD D [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,14-16 * column 2, line 35 - line 51 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 3,4,7-13; | [XA]DE19733973 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,6,14 * column 1, line 30 - line 43 * * figures 1-3 *[A] 3,4,7-13,15,16 |