EP1431509 - Cord lock for shades and roman shades with such a cord lock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2007 [2007/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SILENT GLISS INTERNATIONAL AG Worbstrasse 210 3073 Gümligen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states SILENT GLISS INTERNATIONAL AG Worbstrasse 210 CH-3073 Gumligen/Bern / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grützner, Hans Stockackerstrasse 6 3122 Kehrsatz / CH | 02 /
Flückiger, Werner Walkestrasse 27 3110 Münsingen / CH | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 02406124.4 | 20.12.2002 | [2004/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1431509 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/324 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
E06B9/324 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, LI, NL [2005/11] |
Former [2004/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schnurbremse für einen Vorhang sowie Raffvorhang mit einer solchen Schnurbremse | [2004/26] | English: | Cord lock for shades and roman shades with such a cord lock | [2004/26] | French: | Dispositif de blocage de cordes pour rideau et rideau froncé munie d'un tel dispositif | [2004/26] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 26.04.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE, SI, TR | 24.06.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/13] | 07.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.01.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2002155683 ; | [Y]EP0716212 (NICHIBEI KK [JP]) [Y] 2,5,6 * column 8, line 19 - line 54 * * figure 12 *; | [Y]EP1205138 (MOTTURA SPA [IT]) [Y] 7,9 * paragraph [0010] ** figures 3,4 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020904), vol. 2002, no. 09, & JP2002155683 A 20020531 (NICHIBEI CO LTD) [X] 1,3 * abstract * * figure 2 * [Y] 2,5-7,9 | by applicant | WO0142612 |