30.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
18.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
27.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] |
19.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
12.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
26.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
08.03.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.04.2013 [2013/15] |
08.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
01.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] |
25.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] |
18.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
30.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] |
16.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] |
09.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] |
02.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] |
26.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] |
30.03.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] |
29.03.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
29.03.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
29.11.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.11.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.09.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.05.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.02.2011 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
21.02.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.02.2011 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
20.11.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.01.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.02.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.12.2007 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.12.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.10.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.07.2007 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] |
26.07.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.03.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.03.2007 |
First examination report |
|
13.12.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.07.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
26.04.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.01.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.12.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.12.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.06.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
15.06.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
20.02.2004 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] |
19.01.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] |
30.05.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.07.2003 [2003/29] |