EP1327732 - Edge shuttering for concrete slabs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states System Albanese Amelenweg 16 8400 Winterthur / CH | [2003/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Albanese, Giulio Amelenweg 16 8400 Winterthur / CH | [2003/29] | Representative(s) | Gachnang, Hans Rudolf, et al Gachnang AG Patentanwälte Badstrasse 5 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Gachnang, Hans Rudolf, et al Patentanwalt H.R. Gachnang Badstrasse 5 Postfach 8501 Frauenfeld / CH | ||
Former [N/P] | Gachnang, Hans Rudolf, et al Badstrasse 5 Postfach 323 8501 Frauenfeld / CH | ||
Former [2003/29] | Gachnang, Hans Rudolf, et al Patentanwalt, Badstrasse 5 Postfach 323 8501 Frauenfeld / CH | Application number, filing date | 02406137.6 | 23.12.2002 | [2003/29] | Priority number, date | CH20010002338 | 24.12.2001 Original published format: CH 23382001 | [2003/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1327732 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1327732 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E04G11/36 | [2003/29] | CPC: |
E04B5/32 (EP);
E04B2005/322 (EP);
E04B2005/324 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/29] | Title | German: | Deckenrand-Abschalelement für Betondecken | [2003/29] | English: | Edge shuttering for concrete slabs | [2003/29] | French: | Coffrage de rive pour dalles en béton | [2003/29] | Examination procedure | 27.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 05.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07014365.6 / EP1842984 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.01.2006 | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2010 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   12.02.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.05.2012 | CZ | 02.05.2012 | DK | 02.05.2012 | EE | 02.05.2012 | FI | 02.05.2012 | IT | 02.05.2012 | NL | 02.05.2012 | SE | 02.05.2012 | SI | 02.05.2012 | SK | 02.05.2012 | TR | 02.05.2012 | BG | 02.08.2012 | GR | 03.08.2012 | ES | 13.08.2012 | PT | 03.09.2012 | IE | 23.12.2012 | LU | 23.12.2012 | BE | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
TR | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
IE | 23.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
IE | 23.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/44] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 02.05.2012 | |
SE | 02.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3759009 (RANSOME F) [A] 9* column 1, line 49 - line 68; figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE8328378U (BAUER, ANTON) [X] 1,2,5,10,11 * page 4, line 1 - line 20; figures 1-5 *; | [XY]DE8505592U (PRIX-WERK WIEHOFSKY) [X] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document * [Y] 6-8,12; | [A]DE3542651 (EGCO AG [CH]) [A] 4,5 * page 9, line 17 - page 10, line 19; figures 2,3 *; | [DYA]EP0927796 (SYSTEM ALBANESE [CH]) [DY] 6-8,12 * page 9, paragraph 42 - page 10, paragraph 47; figures 1,16,20 * [A] 3 |