EP1226756 - Machine for producing "taralli" [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Perta, Vito Oronzo via Turati, 9 70011 Alberobello (BA) / IT | For all designated states Perta, Gianfranco via Turati, 9 70011 Alberobello (BA) / IT | [2002/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Perta, Vito Oronzo via Turati, 9 70011 Alberobello (BA) / IT | 02 /
Campanella, Gianvito via Vaccari, 22/A 70011 Alberobello (BA) / IT | [2002/31] | Application number, filing date | 02425007.8 | 09.01.2002 | [2002/31] | Priority number, date | IT2001BA00003 | 12.01.2001 Original published format: IT BA010003 | [2002/31] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1226756 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1226756 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A21C11/00 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
A21C11/002 (EP);
A21C9/088 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/31] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von "Taralli" | [2002/31] | English: | Machine for producing "taralli" | [2002/31] | French: | Dispositif de fabrication de "taralli" | [2002/31] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 01.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.05.2006 | BE | 24.05.2006 | CH | 24.05.2006 | CY | 24.05.2006 | FI | 24.05.2006 | FR | 24.05.2006 | IT | 24.05.2006 | LI | 24.05.2006 | NL | 24.05.2006 | TR | 24.05.2006 | DK | 24.08.2006 | SE | 24.08.2006 | DE | 25.08.2006 | GR | 25.08.2006 | ES | 04.09.2006 | PT | 24.10.2006 | GB | 09.01.2007 | IE | 09.01.2007 | LU | 09.01.2007 | MC | 31.01.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
CY | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
FR | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
DE | 25.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
GB | 09.01.2007 | ||
IE | 09.01.2007 | ||
LU | 09.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2009/01] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
FR | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
DE | 25.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
GB | 09.01.2007 | ||
IE | 09.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
DE | 25.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
GB | 09.01.2007 | ||
IE | 09.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
DE | 25.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
GB | 09.01.2007 | ||
IE | 09.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
DE | 25.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
IE | 09.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
DE | 25.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 24.08.2006 | |
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 24.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2584514 (MEYER THOMPSON, et al); | [A]US3315618 (GROFF EDWIN I); | [XA]EP0329235 (RIJKAART MACHINEFAB [NL]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 6,18,26; | [A]EP0490190 (FRITSCH A GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [A]DE4429382 (TROCKELS UWE [DE], et al) [A] 1,6,26 * the whole document * |