EP1246515 - Solid state current distribution system for DC voltages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.12.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.01.2010 [2010/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grisoni, Massimo Dr. 27, Via G. Ferri 6900 Lugano / CH | [2002/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/40] | Representative(s) | Crippa, Paolo Ernesto Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria 11 25122 Brescia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | Crippa, Paolo Ernesto Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A., Piazzale Arnaldo, 2 25121 Brescia / IT | ||
Former [2002/40] | Manzoni, Alessandro MANZONI & MANZONI, UFFICIO INTERNAZIONALE BREVETTI, P.le Arnaldo 2 25121 Brescia / IT | Application number, filing date | 02425019.3 | 21.01.2002 | [2002/40] | Priority number, date | IT2001BS00004 | 22.01.2001 Original published format: IT BS010004 | [2002/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1246515 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1246515 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | [2005/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20, H02B1/052 | [2002/40] | CPC: |
H05K7/209 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/40] | Title | German: | Festkörperstromverteilungssystem für Gleichspannung | [2002/40] | English: | Solid state current distribution system for DC voltages | [2002/40] | French: | Système de distribution de courant à l'état solide pour courant continu | [2002/40] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/15] | 20.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/04] | 08.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.02.2004 | 31.01.2006 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   20.06.2006 | 31.01.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11121684 ; | [A]EP0373434 (REINSHAGEN KABELWERK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 15; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US5018050 (MAENISHI KOZO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,10 * column 11, line 62 - column 12, line 14; figure 7 *; | [A]EP0998175 (FORD MOTOR CO [US]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0006]; figure 1c * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990730), vol. 1999, no. 09, & JP11121684 A 19990430 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * abstract * |