EP1269839 - Signaller of bite for fishing rod [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2004 [2004/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states O.M.C. di Federici Stefano Via del Lavoro 19 63037 San Benedetto del Tronto (AP) / IT | [2003/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/01] | Application number, filing date | 02425083.9 | 19.02.2002 | [2003/01] | Priority number, date | IT2001AP00002U | 01.03.2001 Original published format: IT AP20010002 U | [2003/04] |
Former [2003/01] | IT2000AP00002U | 01.03.2001 | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1269839 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1269839 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01K97/12 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
A01K97/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/51] |
Former [2003/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Bissanzeigner zum Angeln | [2003/01] | English: | Signaller of bite for fishing rod | [2003/01] | French: | Indicateur de touche pour la pêche | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/27] | 20.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.11.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.11.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4766688 (HILES RICHARD [US]) [X] 1-3,7,8* column 4, line 37 - column 6, line 14; figure - *; | [X]US5228228 (MEISSNER GARRY D [US]) [X] 1-3,7,8 * column 4, line 37 - column 7, line 9; figures 1-6 *; | [X]US5274943 (RATCLIFFE MICHAEL P [CA], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,8 * column 4, line 9 - column 9, line 9; figure - *; | [X]WO0076311 (INTERACTIVE SYSTEMS S R L [IT], et al) [X] 1-8 * page 2, line 14 - page 11, line 11; figure - * |