EP1350711 - Hybrid support structure for a vehicle dashboard and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO THERMAL SYSTEMS S.p.A. Frazione Masio 24 10046 Poirino (Torino) / IT | [2003/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Charbonnel, Daniel 8, rue des Pommiers 78570 Chanteloup les Vignes / FR | [2003/41] | Representative(s) | Marchitelli, Mauro Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Marchitelli, Mauro c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2003/41] | Marchitelli, Mauro c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Srl Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 02425188.6 | 27.03.2002 | [2003/41] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1350711 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1350711 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/14, B62D29/00 | [2003/41] | CPC: |
B62D29/001 (EP,US);
B29C45/1671 (EP,US);
B62D25/14 (EP,US);
B62D29/004 (EP,US);
B29L2031/3002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/41] | Title | German: | Träger in gemischter Bauweise für das Armaturenbrett eines Kraftfahrzeugs und dessen Herstellungsverfahren | [2003/41] | English: | Hybrid support structure for a vehicle dashboard and method for manufacturing the same | [2003/41] | French: | Support hybride pour la planche de bord d'un véhicule automobile et sa méthode de fabrication | [2003/41] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 09.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.08.2006 | CH | 02.08.2006 | CY | 02.08.2006 | FI | 02.08.2006 | IT | 02.08.2006 | LI | 02.08.2006 | NL | 02.08.2006 | DK | 02.11.2006 | GR | 03.11.2006 | IE | 27.03.2007 | LU | 27.03.2007 | MC | 31.03.2007 | [2009/38] |
Former [2008/21] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
IE | 27.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
IE | 27.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4232847 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1* column 2, line 31 - line 62; figures 2-4 *; | [A]DE19626441 (SOMMER ALLIBERT LIGNOTOCK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,8 * column 5, line 25 - line 67; figure 5; claim 7 *; | [A]EP1149717 (BENTELER WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1,8 * column 4, line 12 - line 26; figures 1,7,9 * |