EP1279601 - A sack filling method and apparatus. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2004 [2004/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weitek Industrial Controls S.r.l. Via Sabin, 1, Fraz. Gallo 44020 Poggio Renatico (Ferrara) / IT | [2003/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bassi, Francesco Via Sgarbata, 301 44040 San Bartolomeo in Bosco (Ferrara) / IT | [2003/05] | Representative(s) | Lanzoni, Luciano Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/05] | Lanzoni, Luciano c/o BUGNION S.p.A. Via Goito, 18 40126 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 02425480.7 | 24.07.2002 | [2003/05] | Priority number, date | IT2001BO00477 | 26.07.2001 Original published format: IT BO20010477 | [2003/05] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1279601 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1279601 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | [2003/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65B39/14, B65B43/50, B65B43/60 | [2003/05] | CPC: |
B65B1/06 (EP,US);
B65B39/145 (EP,US);
B65B43/30 (EP,US);
B65B43/465 (EP,US);
B65B43/60 (EP,US);
B65B59/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2004/01] |
Former [2003/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Befüllen von Säcken | [2003/05] | English: | A sack filling method and apparatus. | [2003/05] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour le remplissage de sacs | [2003/05] | Examination procedure | 03.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/27] | 03.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.11.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.11.2003 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB333528 (BROOKE BOND INDIA LTD, et al) [A] 10,18-20,28 * page 1, line 12 - page 4, line 40; figures 1-6 ** page 3, line 93 - line 100 *; | [XY]US3323280 (RAUSCH CLARENCE W) [X] 1-4,6-9,11-14,16,17,21-33 * column 7, line 58 - column 10, line 7; figures 1-39 * * column 15, line 46 - line 62 * * column 17, line 15 - column 31, line 4 * * column 34, line 50 - column 36, line 21 * [Y] 5,15; | [XY]EP0576058 (RONCHI MARIO OFF MEC [IT]) [X] 1-4,6,10-13,16-19,23,27-32 * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 36; figures 1-6 * * column 6, line 18 - line 26 * [Y] 5,15; | [X]EP0673835 (RONCHI MARIO OFF MEC [IT]) [X] 1-3,5-7,10-20,23,27,29 * column 2, line 36 - column 5, line 27; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0844180 (KRAFT FOODS INC [US], et al) [A] 3,14 * column 10, line 33 - line 57; figures 1,8-11 * |