EP1293153 - Circular translation opening system for plates of counters and display units [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.E.M. Nord Est Meccanica S.n.c. Via Redipuglia, 16 34070 S. Pier D'Isonzo (GO) / IT | [2006/03] |
Former [2003/12] | For all designated states N.E.M. Nord Est Meccanica S.n.c. Via Redipuglia, 16 34070 S. Pier D'Isonzo (GO) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cianetti, Alessandro Via Brigata Casale, 55 34170 Gorizia (GO) / IT | [2003/12] | Application number, filing date | 02425526.7 | 13.08.2002 | [2003/12] | Priority number, date | IT2001TS00022 | 17.09.2001 Original published format: IT TS20010022 | [2003/12] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1293153 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1293153 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A47F3/04, A47F3/00, E05D15/34, E05F1/10 | [2003/12] | CPC: |
A47F3/0434 (EP,US);
A47F3/007 (EP,US);
E05D15/34 (EP,US);
E05F1/1091 (EP,US);
A47F2003/008 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/204 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/12] | Title | German: | Mit einer drehbaren Translationsbewegung arbeitendes Öffnungssystem für Scheiben von Verkaufstheken und Präsentationseinheiten | [2003/12] | English: | Circular translation opening system for plates of counters and display units | [2003/12] | French: | Système d'ouverture à mouvement de translation circulaire de vitrines de comptoirs ou d'unités de présentation | [2003/12] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 11.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.01.2006 | CZ | 18.01.2006 | EE | 18.01.2006 | FI | 18.01.2006 | IT | 18.01.2006 | NL | 18.01.2006 | SK | 18.01.2006 | BG | 18.04.2006 | DK | 18.04.2006 | SE | 18.04.2006 | LU | 13.08.2006 | IE | 14.08.2006 | MC | 31.08.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 18.01.2006 | |
EE | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
SK | 18.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
LU | 13.08.2006 | ||
IE | 14.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 18.01.2006 | |
EE | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
SK | 18.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
IE | 14.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 18.01.2006 | |
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
SK | 18.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
IE | 14.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
SK | 18.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
IE | 14.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
SK | 18.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
SK | 18.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
SK | 18.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 18.01.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9119070 (EMANUEL STEPHEN WILLIAM [GB]) [A] 1-4* page 14, line 21 - line 33; figure 9 *; | [A]EP0565900 (ZANUSSI ELETTRODOMESTICI [IT]) [A] 1,5-8 * figure 2 *; | [A]DE4438610 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 5 - line 44; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5639149 (GRASSMUCK MICHAEL D [MX]) [Y] 1 * column A * * column 6, line 36 - line 46; figures 1,3,4 *; | [Y]DE19639661 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [Y] 1 * column 1, line 39 - line 68; figure . * |