EP1422832 - Process and device for synchronization and codegroup identification in CDMA cellular communication systens [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via Olivetti 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (MB) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via Olivetti 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (MB) / IT | ||
Former [2004/22] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pappalardo, Francesco Via Madonna della Scala, 10 95047 Paterno (Catania) / IT | 02 /
Avellone, Giuseppe Via Giovanni Paisiello, 31 90145 Palermo / IT | 03 /
Salurso, Elena Via Giordano, 21 84043 Agropoli (Salerno) / IT | 04 /
Galluzzo, Agostino Piazza Borsellino, 14 92020 Palma di Montechiaro / IT | [2004/22] | Representative(s) | Bosotti, Luciano, et al Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | Bosotti, Luciano, et al c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Srl, Via Maria Vittoria, 18 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 02425619.0 | 11.10.2002 | [2004/22] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1422832 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1422832 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/707 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
H04B1/70735 (EP,US);
H04B1/708 (EP,US);
H04B1/7083 (EP,US);
H04B2201/70702 (EP,US);
H04B2201/70707 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/07] |
Former [2004/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Synchronisierung und Identifizierung der Kodengruppe in zellularen CDMA-Übertragungssystemen | [2004/22] | English: | Process and device for synchronization and codegroup identification in CDMA cellular communication systens | [2004/22] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la synchronisation et l'identification du groupe de codes dans des systèmes de communications cellulaires AMRC | [2004/22] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/39] | 27.11.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.03.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | 16.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.01.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 22.07.2009 | FR | 02.11.2009 | [2011/14] |
Former [2010/35] | FR | 02.11.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1100210 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [X] 1-4,6-9,11 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 11 - page 3, paragraph 18 * * page 5, paragraph 48 - paragraph 52 * * page 5, paragraph 59 * * claims 1,2 * * figures 3,4,7,8 * [A] 5,10; | [A]US2002057664 (SARKAR SANDIP [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 2, paragraph 16 - paragraph 18 * * page 2, paragraph 23 - paragraph 24 ** figure 3 *; | [X]EP1215829 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [X] 1-3,6-8,11 * page 6, paragraph 70 * * page 16, paragraph 175 - paragraph 180 * * claims 1,3 * * figures 10,13 * | by applicant | WO03026147 |