EP1420104 - Process for drying laundry in a drying device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2014 | Opposition rejected | published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Candy S.p.A. Via Missori, 8 20052 Monza (MI) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/20] | For all designated states CANDY S.p.A. Via Missori, 8 20052 Monza (Milano) / IT | ||
Former [2004/21] | For all designated states CANDY S.p.A. Via Missori, 8 I-20052 Monza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fumagalli, Silvano Via Grigna, 2 20052 Monza (Milano) / IT | [2004/21] | Representative(s) | Crippa, Paolo Ernesto, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/21] | Crippa, Paolo Ernesto, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 02425697.6 | 15.11.2002 | [2004/21] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1420104 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1420104 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | D06F58/28 | [2004/21] | CPC: |
D06F58/38 (EP,US);
D06F2101/00 (EP,US);
D06F2101/12 (EP,US);
D06F2101/14 (EP,US);
D06F2103/08 (EP,US);
D06F2103/10 (EP,US);
D06F2103/32 (EP,US);
D06F2103/38 (EP,US);
D06F2105/12 (EP,US);
D06F2105/20 (EP,US);
D06F2105/28 (EP,US);
D06F2105/52 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2005/06] |
Former [2004/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Trocknen von Wäsche in einer Trocknungsvorrichtung | [2004/21] | English: | Process for drying laundry in a drying device | [2004/21] | French: | Procédé de séchage du linge dans un dispositif de séchage | [2004/21] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/48] | 20.11.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.03.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | 23.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.02.2008
ADMISSIBLE Indesit Company S.p.A. Viale Aristide Merloni, 47 60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT Opponent's representative Dini, Roberto Metroconsult S.r.l. Via Sestriere 100 10060 None (TO) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.02.2008
ADMISSIBLE Indesit Company S.p.A. Viale Aristide Merloni, 47 60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT Opponent's representative Dini, Roberto Metroconsult S.r.l. Via Sestriere 100 10060 None (Torino) / IT | 25.03.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.07.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.11.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.12.2010 | 10.12.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.12.2010 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 30.09.2014 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2015/01] | Appeal following opposition | 28.02.2011 | Appeal received No. T0495/11 | 29.04.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 30.09.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 30.09.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.10.2014 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.12.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.12.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.12.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 28.12.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.12.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.12.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 28.12.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.12.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.12.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.12.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.12.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.12.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.12.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.12.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.12.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.12.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.12.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.12.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.12.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.12.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 15.11.2013 | IT | 15.11.2013 | DE | 03.06.2014 | [2014/51] |
Former [2014/38] | IT | 15.11.2013 | |
DE | 03.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2002062048 ; | [Y]US3213548 (DEATON HOMER W) [Y] 3,7 * column 1, line 19 - line 44 * * figures 1,2,4-6 *; | [X]DE1460875 (CONSTRUCTA WERKE GMBH) [X] 1,4-6,12-14,18 * page 3, paragraphs 2-5 * * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [Y]US4206552 (GOLDSTEIN SANDERS [US], et al) [Y] 9,10 * column 3, line 1 - line 67 *; | [Y]US4385451 (WESLEY VICTOR J [GB]) [Y] 11,17* column 1, line 33 - column 2, line 17 *; | [XY]DE19725536 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,13-16 * whole document * [Y] 3,7,9-11,17 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020604), vol. 2002, no. 06, & JP2002062048 A 20020228 (TOKYO GAS CO LTD) [X] 1,4,6,13-15 * abstract * |