EP1329570 - Universal spatula [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hobza, Michael Senningerstrasse 49 2000 Stockerau / AT | [2003/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/30] | Representative(s) | Rippel, Andreas, et al Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Rippel Kommandit-Partnerschaft Maxingstrasse 34 1130 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/30] | Rippel, Andreas, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Rippel Kommandit-Partnerschaft Maxingstrasse 34 1130 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 02450153.8 | 08.07.2002 | [2003/30] | Priority number, date | AT20010001062 | 09.07.2001 Original published format: AT 10622001 | [2003/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1329570 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E04F21/06, E04F21/16, B05C17/10 | [2003/30] | CPC: |
E04F21/06 (EP);
E04F21/161 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/30] | Title | German: | Universalspachtel | [2003/30] | English: | Universal spatula | [2003/30] | French: | Spatule universelle | [2003/30] | Examination procedure | 11.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/33] | 29.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/27] | 12.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.11.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US952971 (WOLARY WILBUR W [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]US1083099 (HOWG CARL M [US]) [A] 1-3* the whole document * |