EP1310776 - Monitoring system for vehicle tanks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kreindl Andreas Leitenweg 4 4040 Linz / AT | [2003/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/20] | Representative(s) | Hübscher, Helmut, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Hübscher Postfach 411 4010 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | Hübscher, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Hübscher & Hübscher Postfach 380 Spittelwiese 7 4021 Linz / AT | ||
Former [2003/20] | Hübscher, Heiner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Spittelwiese 7 4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 02450256.9 | 07.11.2002 | [2003/20] | Priority number, date | AT20010001781 | 13.11.2001 Original published format: AT 17812001 | [2003/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1310776 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1310776 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | [2007/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01F9/00, G01F23/68 | [2003/20] | CPC: |
G01F9/008 (EP);
G01F23/68 (EP);
G01F23/802 (EP);
G01F23/804 (EP);
G01F25/20 (EP);
G07C5/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/20] | Title | German: | System zur Überwachung von Fahrzeugtanks | [2003/20] | English: | Monitoring system for vehicle tanks | [2003/20] | French: | Système de surveillance des réservoirs des voitures | [2003/20] | Examination procedure | 28.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/41] | 09.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/15] | 23.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4079627 (GUNDLACH PHILIP M) [A] 1,7 * column 10, line 21 - column 15, line 25; figures 9-17 *; | [A]US4553216 (STEVENS GLENN G [US], et al) [A] 1,12 * column 13, line 67 - column 14, line 16; figure 9 *; | [DA]DE19537024 (AUGUSTIN DANIELA [AT]) [DA] 1-13 * column 1, line 40 - column 5, line 59; figure . *; | [A]US5918193 (JAMIESON BRIAN THOMAS [US]) [A] 1-3* column 6, line 50 - column 8, line 37; figures 5-7 * | Examination | US6006148 |