EP1373522 - D-CARBAMOYLASE FROM ARTHROBACTER CRYSTALLOPOIETES DSM 20117 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | [2007/08] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Degussa AG Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRAUZ, Karlheinz Zur Marienruhe 13 63579 Freigericht / DE | 02 /
MAY, Oliver Am Rebenborn 17A 60388 Frankfurt / DE | 03 /
BOMMARIUS, Andreas 1105 Vernon Springs Court Atlanta, GA 30327 / US | 04 /
SYLDATK, Christoph Reinbeckstrasse 29B 70565 Stuttgart / DE | 05 /
ALTENBUCHNER, Josef Hindenburgstrasse 6 71154 Nufringen / DE | 06 /
WERNER, Markus Römerreuthstrasse 1A 91056 Erlangen / DE | 07 /
SIEMANN-HERZBERG, Martin Röteweg 24/2 72218 Wildberg / DE | [2004/01] | Application number, filing date | 02700264.1 | 21.02.2002 | [2004/01] | WO2002EP01840 | Priority number, date | DE2001114999 | 26.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10114999 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02077212 | Date: | 03.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1373522 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1373522 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/55, C12N9/80, C12N15/11, C12N1/20, C12P13/04, C12P41/00, C12N15/10, C12Q1/68, // (C12N1/20, C12R1:06) | [2004/01] | CPC: |
C12N9/80 (EP,US);
C12P13/04 (EP,US);
C12P41/009 (EP,US);
C12N2310/111 (EP,US);
G01N2333/195 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Title | German: | D-CARBAMOYLASE AUS ARTHROBACTER CRYSTALLOPOIETES DSM 20117 | [2004/01] | English: | D-CARBAMOYLASE FROM ARTHROBACTER CRYSTALLOPOIETES DSM 20117 | [2004/01] | French: | D-CARBAMOYLASE PROVENANT DE L'ORGANISME ARTHROBACTER CRYSTALLOPOIETES DSM 20117 | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.08.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 18.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.05.2006 | FI | 03.05.2006 | TR | 03.05.2006 | GR | 04.08.2006 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | CY | 03.05.2006 | |
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
GR | 04.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | FI | 03.05.2006 | |
GR | 04.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/04] | FI | 03.05.2006 | |
Former [2007/38] | FI | 03.05.2006 | |
IT | 03.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 03.05.2006 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9400577 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 2,3,5,8 * the whole document *; | [XY] - MOELLER A ET AL, "STEREO AND SUBSTRATE-SPECIFICITY OF A D HYDANTOINASE AND A D-N CARBAMYL-AMINO ACID AMIDOHYDROLASE OF ARTHROBACTER-CRYSTALLOPOIETES AM 2", ENZYME AND MICROBIAL TECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 10, no. 10, ISSN 0141-0229, pages 618 - 625, XP008007367 [X] 1,4,6,7 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,5,8-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0141-0229(88)90109-3 | [X] - GRIFANTINI RENATA ET AL, "Efficient conversion of 5-substituted hydantoins to D-alpha-amino acids using recombinant Escherichia coli strains", MICROBIOLOGY, SOCIETY FOR GENERAL MICROBIOLOGY, READING, GB, (199804), vol. 144, no. 4, ISSN 1350-0872, pages 947 - 954, XP002154848 [X] 9-11 * page 948, column R, paragraph 3 - page 951, column R, paragraph 4 * | [Y] - IKENAKA Y ET AL, "Screening, characterization, and cloning of the gene for N-carbamyl-D-amino acid amidohydrolase from thermotolerant soil bacteria.", BIOSCIENCE, BIOTECHNOLOGY, AND BIOCHEMISTRY. JAPAN MAY 1998, (199805), vol. 62, no. 5, ISSN 0916-8451, pages 882 - 886, XP001074193 [Y] 2,3,5,8-11 * page 883, column L, paragraph 2 - page 884, column R, paragraph 1; figures 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1271/bbb.62.882 | [Y] - BUSON A ET AL, "IDENTIFICATION SEQUENCING AND MUTAGENESIS OF THE GENE FOR A D-CARBAMOYLASE FROM AGROBACTERIUM RADIOBACTER", FEMS MICROBIOLOGY LETTERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1996), vol. 145, ISSN 0378-1097, pages 55 - 62, XP002934364 [Y] 2,3,5,8 * page 56, column R, paragraph 2 - page 57, column R, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1097(96)00385-0 | [YD] - NANBA H ET AL, "Isolation of Agrobacterium sp. strain KNK712 that produces N-carbamyl-D-amino acid amidohydrolase, cloning of the gene for this enzyme, and properties of the enzyme.", BIOSCIENCE, BIOTECHNOLOGY, AND BIOCHEMISTRY. JAPAN MAY 1998, (199805), vol. 62, no. 5, ISSN 0916-8451, pages 875 - 881, XP001074192 [YD] 2,3,5,8 * page 876, column L, paragraph 3 - page 878, column L, paragraph 3; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1271/bbb.62.875 | [A] - SYLDATK C ET AL, "MICROBIAL AND ENZYMATIC PRODUCTION OF D-AMINO ACIDS FROM DL-5-MONOSUBSTITUTED HYDANTOINS", BIOCATALYTIC PRODUCTION OF AMINO ACIDS AND DERIVATIVES, XX, XX, (1992), pages 75 - 128, XP000991524 [A] 1-11 * page 95, paragraph L - page 116, paragraph 1 * | Examination | - YOSHIKAWA Y. ET AL, "Cancer associated gene primer 31", GENESEQ, DERWENT, (19981116), URL: EBI |