EP1363234 - SIGNAL PROCESSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/11] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | ||
Former [2003/47] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONDO, Tetsujiro, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2003/47] | Representative(s) | Turner, James Arthur, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | Turner, James Arthur, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2003/47] | Pratt, Richard Wilson D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02700665.9 | 21.02.2002 | [2003/47] | WO2002JP01541 | Priority number, date | JP20010045249 | 21.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001045249 | [2003/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02067192 | Date: | 29.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1363234 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1363234 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.08.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06N1/00, G05B13/02 | [2003/47] | CPC: |
G05B13/028 (EP,US);
G06T1/00 (KR);
G05B13/0265 (EP,US);
G06N20/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/11] |
Former [2003/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | SIGNALVERARBEITUNGSEINRICHTUNG | [2003/47] | English: | SIGNAL PROCESSING DEVICE | [2003/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAUX | [2003/47] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2002 | Translation filed | 08.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2002 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/47] | 27.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1001371 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,23-25 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1001373 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,23-25* the whole document * | International search | [X]JPH0580626 (CANON KK); | [A]EP1001372 (SONY CORP [JP]) | by applicant | EP1001371 |