EP1380640 - Cell or tissue culture apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/03] | CELL AND STRUCTURE INCUBATOR | ||
[2009/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.10.2010 [2010/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takagi Industrial Co., Ltd. 201, Nishikashiwabarashinden Fuji-shi Shizuoka-ken 417-8505 / JP | [2009/45] |
Former [2004/03] | For all designated states Takagi Industrial Co., Ltd. 201, Nishikashiwabarashinden Fuji-shi, Shizuoka-ken 417-8505 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAGI, Takao, c/o TAKAGI INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 201, Nishikashiwabarashinden Fuji-shi, Shizuoka 417-8505 / JP | 02 /
WATANABE, Setsuo, c/o TAKAGI INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 201, Nishikashiwabarashinden Fuji-shi, Shizuoka 417-8505 / JP | [2004/03] | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/03] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 02700699.8 | 22.02.2002 | [2004/03] | WO2002JP01592 | Priority number, date | JP20010118757 | 17.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001118757 | [2004/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02086056 | Date: | 31.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1380640 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1380640 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.10.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12M3/02 | [2004/03] | CPC: |
C12M25/06 (EP,US);
C12M27/14 (EP,US);
C12M35/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI [2009/45] |
Former [2009/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, FI, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, TR | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Zell- bzw. Gewebezüchtung | [2009/05] | English: | Cell or tissue culture apparatus | [2009/05] | French: | Appareil pour la culture des cellules ou du tissu | [2009/05] |
Former [2004/03] | ZELL- UND STRUKTURINKUBATOR | ||
Former [2004/03] | CELL AND STRUCTURE INCUBATOR | ||
Former [2004/03] | INCUBATEUR POUR CELLULES ET STRUCTURES CULTIVEES | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2003 | Translation filed | 31.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2003 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 31.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/03] | 15.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9822573 (ADVANCED TISSUE SCIENCES INC [US]) [A] 1-10* page 6, line 8 - page 7, line 26; figure 3 * | International search | [A]JPH037575 (SHIMADZU CORP); | [X]JPH11239474 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP, et al) |