EP1389326 - A SYSTEM FOR RECOMMENDING CROPS AND ATTACHMENTS TO FARM TRACTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/08] | For all designated states Honda Giken Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Minami Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUJI, Hideki c/oHonda Giken Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Minami-aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [2004/08] | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/08] | Rupp, Christian, Dipl.Phys., et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02700776.4 | 26.02.2002 | [2004/08] | WO2002JP01703 | Priority number, date | JP20010072723 | 14.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001072723 | JP20010081241 | 21.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001081241 | JP20010081242 | 21.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001081242 | JP20010085896 | 23.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001085896 | JP20010089524 | 27.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001089524 | [2004/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02073484 | Date: | 19.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1389326 | Date: | 18.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2004/08] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/08] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM EMPFEHLEN VON NUTZPFLANZEN UND LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHEN TRAKTOR-ANHÄNGEVORRICHTUNGEN | [2004/08] | English: | A SYSTEM FOR RECOMMENDING CROPS AND ATTACHMENTS TO FARM TRACTORS | [2004/08] | French: | SYSTEME DESTINE A RECOMMANDER DES CULTURES ET DES EQUIPEMENTS POUR TRACTEURS AGRICOLES | [2004/08] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/08] | 13.11.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |