EP1377535 - PROCESS FOR SELECTIVE TRIMERISATION OF OLEFINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/02] | CATALYST SYSTEM FOR THE TRIMERISATION OF OLEFINS | ||
[2008/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stichting Dutch Polymer Institute Kennispoort John F. Kennedylaan 2 5612 AB Eindhoven / NL | [2008/35] |
Former [2004/02] | For all designated states Stichting Dutch Polymer Institute Kennispoort 2 John F. Kennedylaan 5612 AB Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DECKERS, Patrick, Jozef, Wilhelmus 6, Bankastraat NL-9715 CA Groningen / NL | 02 /
HESSEN, Bart Heideweg 10 NL-9824 TJ Noordwijk / NL | [2004/02] | Representative(s) | Renkema, Jaap, et al IPecunia Patents B.V. P.O. Box 593 6160 AN Geleen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Renkema, Jaap, et al Ipecunia B.V. P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN Den Bosch / NL | ||
Former [2005/25] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2004/02] | Barendregt, Frank, Drs., et al Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 02700895.2 | 22.02.2002 | [2004/02] | WO2002NL00119 | Priority number, date | WO2001NL00149 | 22.02.2001 Original published format: PCT/NL01/00149 | [2004/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02066405 | Date: | 29.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1377535 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1377535 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07C2/32, B01J31/22 | [2004/02] | CPC: |
C07C2/34 (EP,US);
C07C2/32 (KR);
B01J31/143 (EP,US);
B01J31/1608 (EP,US);
B01J31/2295 (EP,US);
B01J21/063 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SELEKTIVEN TRIMERISIERUNG VON OLEFINEN | [2008/13] | English: | PROCESS FOR SELECTIVE TRIMERISATION OF OLEFINS | [2008/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA TRIMERISATION SÉLECTIVE D'OLEFINES | [2008/13] |
Former [2004/02] | KATALYSATORSYSTEM ZUR TRIMERISIERUNG VON OLEFINEN | ||
Former [2004/02] | CATALYST SYSTEM FOR THE TRIMERISATION OF OLEFINS | ||
Former [2004/02] | SYSTEME DE CATALYSEUR POUR LA TRIMERISATION D'OLEFINES | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.09.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/02] | 09.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.08.2008 | BE | 27.08.2008 | CY | 27.08.2008 | DK | 27.08.2008 | FI | 27.08.2008 | IT | 27.08.2008 | NL | 27.08.2008 | TR | 27.08.2008 | SE | 27.11.2008 | GR | 28.11.2008 | ES | 08.12.2008 | PT | 27.01.2009 | GB | 22.02.2009 | IE | 22.02.2009 | LU | 22.02.2009 | CH | 28.02.2009 | LI | 28.02.2009 | MC | 28.02.2009 | FR | 02.03.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
GR | 28.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
GB | 22.02.2009 | ||
IE | 22.02.2009 | ||
LU | 22.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
GR | 28.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
GB | 22.02.2009 | ||
IE | 22.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
GB | 22.02.2009 | ||
IE | 22.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
IE | 22.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
IE | 22.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
IE | 22.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/42] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 27.08.2008 | |
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 27.08.2008 | |
ES | 08.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0608447 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO) [DA] 14,15 * claims 20-24 *; | [A]WO9425416 (SHELL INT RESEARCH) [A] 14,15 * page 2, line 14 - page 3, line 4 * | [DX] - SASSMANNSHAUSEN J ET AL, "HALF-SANDWICH COMPLEXES OF TITANIUM AND ZIRCONIUM WITH PENDANT PHENYL SUBSTITUENTS. THE INFLUENCE OF ANSA-ARYL COORDINATION ON THEPOLYMERISATION ACTIVITY OF HALF-SANDWICH CATALYSTS", JOURNAL OF ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, (1999), vol. 592, ISSN 0022-328X, pages 84 - 94, XP001033815 [DX] 1-13 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-328X(99)00488-X |