EP1358414 - VALVE WITH SNAP-ON LINER IN THE BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KSB S.A.S 4, Allée des Barbanniers 92230 Gennevilliers / FR | [2003/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATTIGNIER, Claude 28, avenue de Breuil F-33400 Talence / FR | 02 /
COURCEL, Jean-Claude 8, Impasse Pinsons F-33140 Villenave d'Ornon / FR | 03 /
LARRIEU, Lucien Gure Doya Ahaxe Alciette Bascassan F-64220 St Jean Pied De Port / FR | 04 /
OLIVIER, Philippe 2 allée Hautefort F-33170 Gradignan / FR | [2004/06] |
Former [2003/45] | 01 /
WATTIGNIER, Claude 28, avenue de Breuil F-33400 Talence / FR | ||
02 /
COURCEL, Jean-Claude 8, Impasse Pinsons F-33140 Villenave d'Ornon / FR | |||
03 /
LARRIEU, Lucien Gure Doya Ahaxe Alciette Bascassan F-64220 St Jean Pied De Port / FR | |||
04 /
OLIVIER, Philippe 97, rue Roustaing F-33400 Talence / FR | Representative(s) | Eidelsberg, Victor Albert, et al Cabinet Flechner 22, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/45] | Eidelsberg, Albert, et al Cabinet Flechner 22, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02701338.2 | 29.01.2002 | [2003/45] | WO2002FR00342 | Priority number, date | FR20010001211 | 30.01.2001 Original published format: FR 0101211 | [2003/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02061311 | Date: | 08.08.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1358414 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1358414 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16K1/226 | [2003/45] | CPC: |
F16K1/2265 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLAPPEGEHÄUSE MIT EINGERASTETER MANCHETTE | [2003/45] | English: | VALVE WITH SNAP-ON LINER IN THE BODY | [2003/45] | French: | ROBINET A MANCHETTE ENCLIQUETEE DANS LE CORPS | [2003/45] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 29.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.05.2007 | CY | 30.05.2007 | IE | 30.05.2007 | GR | 31.08.2007 | LU | 29.01.2008 | CH | 31.01.2008 | LI | 31.01.2008 | MC | 31.01.2008 | [2010/32] |
Former [2009/33] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
CY | 30.05.2007 | ||
IE | 30.05.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
IE | 30.05.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
IE | 30.05.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
IE | 30.05.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
IE | 30.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 30.05.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3215400 (MULLER FRANK G) [A] 1 * column 4, line 5 - line 19; figure 6 *; | [A]US4006882 (BONAFOUS MAURICE) [A] 1 * column 2, line 17 - line 42; figures 3,8 *; | [A]US4133513 (MEYER PAUL L) [A] 1* column 3, line 21 - line 39; figures 3,5,6 *; | [A]US4653724 (GARRIGUES JEAN-CLAUDE [FR], et al) [A] 1 * column 6, line 21 - line 25; figure 3 * |