EP1358050 - ADAPTER DEVICE FOR PLACING CLIPS INSTEAD OF STAPLES IN A FRAME ASSEMBLING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Societe Cassese (S.A.) Zone Industrielle 77390 Verneuil L'Etang / FR | [2003/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASSESE, Pierre 141 rue de la Mairie F-77720 St Ouen en Brie / FR | 02 /
CASSESE, Alain 3, allée de la Marnière F-77720 Breau / FR | 03 /
CASSESE, Jean 83, rue de Meaux F-77390 GUINES / FR | 04 /
CASSESE, Philippe 8, Les Essarts F-77950 St Germain Laxis / FR | [2003/51] |
Former [2003/45] | 01 /
CASSESE, Pierre 141 rue de la Mairie F-77720 St Ouen en Brie / FR | ||
02 /
CASSESE, Alain 3, allée de la Marnière F-77720 Breau / FR | |||
03 /
CASSESE, Jean 3, place du Colombier, Esc b - no39 F-77127 Lieusaint / FR | |||
04 /
CASSESE, Philippe 8, Les Essarts F-77950 St Germain Laxis / FR | Representative(s) | Lhuillier, René, et al Lepeudry et Associés 43, rue de la Brèche aux Loups 75012 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/45] | Lhuillier, René, et al Cabinet Lepeudry, 43, rue de la Brèche-aux-Loups 75012 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02701397.8 | 04.02.2002 | [2003/45] | WO2002FR00414 | Priority number, date | FR20010001554 | 06.02.2001 Original published format: FR 0101554 | [2003/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02062543 | Date: | 15.08.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1358050 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B27F7/00, B27F7/02 | [2003/45] | CPC: |
B27F7/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ADAPTER ZUM ANBRINGEN VON BESCHLÄGEN AN STELLE VON KLAMMERN IN EINER MONTAGEVORRICHTUNG FÜR RAHMEN | [2003/45] | English: | ADAPTER DEVICE FOR PLACING CLIPS INSTEAD OF STAPLES IN A FRAME ASSEMBLING MACHINE | [2003/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF ADAPTATEUR POUR LA MISE EN PLACE D'ATTACHES A LA PLACE D'AGRAFES, DANS UNE MACHINE D'ASSEMBLAGE DE CADRES | [2003/45] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 01.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/09] | 11.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0551181 (MAGNOLIA GROUP PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1 * page 2, lines 21-43; figure - *; | [A]FR2609925 (BUCAILLE BERNARD [FR]) [A] 1 * page 1, paragraph L; figure - *; | [A]US5890276 (LORINCZ EUGENE M [US]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 14 - column 6, line 9; figure - *; | [A]US4709494 (KENNEDY GARY D [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 7 - column 3, line 39; figure - * |