EP1384493 - IRRADIATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2012 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8315 / JP | [2011/26] |
Former [2004/05] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Co., Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8315 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIHARA, Kazumasa, @Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Ltd. Hirosh.M.W. 6-22-4, Kan-on-shin-machi Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima / JP | 02 /
KAMINOU, Yuichiro, @Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Ltd Nagoya A.S.W. 10, Oye-cho Minato-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 455-8515 / JP | 03 /
ISHIBASHI, Akira, @Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8315 / JP | [2011/47] |
Former [2004/05] | 01 /
MIHARA, Kazumasa, Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Ltd. Hirosh.M.W., 6-22-4, Kan-on-shin-machi, Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima / JP | ||
02 /
KAMINOU, Yuichiro, Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Ltd Nagoya A.S.W., 10, Oye-cho, Minato-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 455-8515 / JP | |||
03 /
ISHIBASHI, Akira, Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8315 / JP | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/47] | Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/05] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02701623.7 | 28.02.2002 | [2004/05] | WO2002JP01836 | Priority number, date | JP20010058732 | 02.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001058732 | [2004/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02070067 | Date: | 12.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1384493 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1384493 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.09.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/10 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
H01J35/04 (EP,US);
A61N5/10 (EP,US);
G21G1/12 (EP,US);
G21H5/02 (EP,US);
A61B6/4429 (EP,US);
A61N5/01 (EP,US);
H01J35/186 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, SE [2004/05] | Title | German: | BESTRAHLUNGSGERÄT | [2004/05] | English: | IRRADIATOR | [2004/05] | French: | IRRADIATEUR | [2004/05] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2002 | Translation filed | 27.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2002 | Search fee paid | 27.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2002 | Examination requested [2004/05] | 05.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 23.11.2011 | DK | 23.11.2011 | IT | 23.11.2011 | SE | 23.11.2011 | GB | 28.02.2012 | FR | 29.02.2012 | [2013/10] |
Former [2013/07] | BE | 23.11.2011 | |
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 23.11.2011 | |
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 23.11.2011 | |
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 23.11.2011 | |
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | SE | 23.11.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4020431 (SAUNDERS ROGER A) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [XA]US5332908 (WEIDLICH GEORG A [US]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 1, lines 18-27,32-38 * * column 4, line 47 - column 5, line 11 *[A] 9; | [X]EP0702982 (HITESYS SPA [IT]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 32 * * column 5, lines 5-26 * * column 6, lines 10-25 * * claims 1-3 *; | [X]EP0813893 (SIEMENS MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 19 * | International search | [A]JPS57185872 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]US4628523 (HEFLIN CHESTER L [US]); | [A]JPH0315448 (GEN ELECTRIC CGR); | [A]WO9116948 (CYRULNIK REUVEN AVRAHOM [US]); | [A]JPH0751395 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP); | [A]US6094760 (NONAKA HIDEKI [JP], et al); | [X]JP2001009050 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP) | Examination | US5386453 | by applicant | EP0702982 |