EP1368362 - ASCORBIC ACID 2-PHOSPHATE METAL SALT WITH LOW CALCIUM CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Showa Denko K.K. 13-9, Shiba Daimon, 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/50] | For all designated states SHOWA DENKO K.K. 13-9, Shiba Daimon, 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJIWARA, Yoshio, KAWASAKI PLANT, SHOWA DENKO K.K 2-3, Chidori-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagaawa 210-0865 / JP | 02 /
KOBAYASHI, Yuji, KAWASAKI PLANT, SHOWA DENKO K.K. 2-3, Chidori-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0865 / JP | 03 /
SAITO, Makoto, KAWASAKI PLANT, SHOWA DENKO K.K. 2-3, Chidori-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0865 / JP | [2003/50] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2003/50] | Application number, filing date | 02701682.3 | 01.03.2002 | [2003/50] | WO2002JP01926 | Priority number, date | JP20010057982 | 02.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001057982 | US20010275033P | 13.03.2001 Original published format: US 275033 P | [2003/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02070531 | Date: | 12.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1368362 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/655, A61K7/48 | [2003/50] | CPC: |
C07F9/65515 (EP);
A61K8/676 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ASCORBINSÄURE-2-PHOSPHAT METALSALZ MIT GERINGEM KALZIUM GEHALT | [2003/50] | English: | ASCORBIC ACID 2-PHOSPHATE METAL SALT WITH LOW CALCIUM CONTENT | [2003/50] | French: | SEL DE METAL D'ACIDE ASCORBIQUE-2-PHOSPHATE A FAIBLE TENEUR DE CALCIUM | [2003/50] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 15.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/13] | 07.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.12.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0884321 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [X] 1-17 * the whole document * * page 5, line 9 - line 11 *; | [X]US6121464 (BOETTCHER ANDREAS ET AL) [X] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH02131494 ; | [XD]US4999437 (DOBLER WALTER ET AL) [XD] 1-17 * the whole document * * claim 9 *; | [X]JPS63243014 ; | [A]EP0866069 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE) [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900802), vol. 014, no. 356, Database accession no. (C - 0745), & JP02131494 A 19900521 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO LTD) [X] 1-17 * abstract * * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890203), vol. 013, no. 049, Database accession no. (C - 565), & JP63243014 A 19881007 (POLA CHEM IND INC) [X] 1-5,13-15 * abstract * * the whole document * |