EP1374876 - METHOD OF TREATING TUMOR AND CONSIGNMENT SYSTEM OF PROLIFERATING AND PROCESSING ACTIVATED LYMPHOCYTES TO BE USED IN PARALLEL TO PDT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lymphotec Inc. 5-26-9, Hakusan, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Lymphotec Inc. 5-26-9, Hakusan, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANAI, Hideo 8-8-901, Shima 1-chome Ube-shi, Yamaguchi 755-0047 / JP | 02 /
OKITA, Kiwamu 4243-5, Egashira, Nishikiwa-ku Ube-shi, Yamaguchi 755-0151 / JP | 03 /
KUROIWA, Yasuyuki 2055-5, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-0062 / JP | 04 /
SEKINE, Teruaki 1-1-13-420, Shiohama Koto-ku, Tokyo 135-0043 / JP | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Eddowes, Simon, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Eddowes, Simon, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | Application number, filing date | 02701720.1 | 05.03.2002 | [2004/01] | WO2002JP01997 | Priority number, date | JP20010059408 | 05.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001059408 | [2004/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02069990 | Date: | 12.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1374876 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.09.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/14, A61K41/00, A61P35/00, A61P43/00, C12N15/00 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
A61K41/0057 (EP,US);
A61K35/17 (US);
A61K39/461 (EP);
A61K39/4644 (EP);
A61K41/0071 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K2035/124 (EP,US);
A61K2239/31 (EP);
A61K2239/38 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/01] | A61K35/14, A61K41/00, A61P35/00, A61P43/00, // C12N15:00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON TUMOREN UND VERSENDUNGSSYSTEM ZUR PROLIFERATION UND AUFARBEITUNG VON AKTIVIERTEN LYMPHOZYTEN ZUR PARALLELEN VERWENDUNG MIT PDT | [2004/01] | English: | METHOD OF TREATING TUMOR AND CONSIGNMENT SYSTEM OF PROLIFERATING AND PROCESSING ACTIVATED LYMPHOCYTES TO BE USED IN PARALLEL TO PDT | [2004/01] | French: | METHODE DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE TUMEUR ET SYSTEME SERVANT A LA PROLIFERATION ET AU TRAITEMENT DE LYMPHOCYTES ACTIVEES DESTINEES A UNE UTILISATION PARALLELE A LA THERAPIE TPD | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2003 | Translation filed | 15.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2003 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 12.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/10] | 19.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0064476 (QUADRA LOGIC TECH INC [CA], et al) [X] 1-7 * page 3, column 2 - column 3 ** page 8, column 3 * | International search | [Y]EP0409655 (ORTHO PHARMA CORP [US]); | [Y]JPH10167971 (SEKINE TERUAKI); | [Y]WO9947162 (WOUND HEALING OF OKLAHOMA INC [US]); | [Y]WO9950269 (SCHASTAK ASTRID [DE], et al); | [Y]JP2000212200 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD, et al); | [AP]JP2001354575 (HUMAN TEKKU KK) | Examination | - SEKINE T. ET AL, "A feasible method for expansion of peripheral blood lymphocytes by culture with immobilized anti-CD3 monoclonal antibody and interleukin-2 for use in adoptive immunotherapy of cancer patients", BIOMEDICINE AND PHARMACOTHERAPY, (1998), vol. 47, no. 2-3, pages 73 - 78, XP008007270 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0753-3322(93)90294-U |