EP1356533 - FUEL CELLS WITH INTEGRATED HUMIDIFICATION AND METHOD FOR HUMIDIFYING FUEL CELL PROCESS GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Viessmann Werke GmbH & Co Viessmannstrasse 1 35107 Allendorf / DE | [2003/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHOLTA, Joachim Hirschstrasse 35 89278 Nersingen / DE | 02 /
JÖRRISEN, Ludwig Ludwigstrasse 31 89231 Neu-Ulm / DE | 03 /
GAUGLER, Bernd Kohlgasse 15 89075 Ulm / DE | [2004/01] |
Former [2003/51] | 01 /
SCHOLTA, Joachim Hirschstrasse 13 89278 Nersingen / DE | ||
02 /
JÖRRISEN, Ludwig Ludwigstrasse 31 89231 Neu-Ulm / DE | |||
03 /
GAUGLER, Bernd Kohlgasse 15 89075 Ulm / DE | |||
Former [2003/44] | 01 /
SCHOLTA, Joachim Hirschstrasse 13 89278 Nersingen / DE | ||
02 /
JÖRRISEN, Ludwig Ludwigstrasse 31 89231 Neu-Ulm / DE | |||
03 /
GAUGLER, Bernd Schaffnerstrasse 17 89073 Ulm / DE | Representative(s) | Wolf, Günter An der Mainbrücke 16 63456 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Wolf, Günter An der Mainbrücke 16 Postfach 700245 63427 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [2003/44] | Wolf, Günter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Günter Wolf, An der Mainbrücke 16 63456 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 02702221.9 | 30.01.2002 | [2003/44] | WO2002DE00334 | Priority number, date | DE2001104246 | 31.01.2001 Original published format: DE 10104246 | [2003/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02061867 | Date: | 08.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1356533 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1356533 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04 | [2003/44] | CPC: |
H01M8/04014 (EP,US);
H01M8/04119 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/44] | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFZELLEN MIT INTEGRIERTER BEFEUCHTUNG SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM BEFEUCHTEN VON BRENNSTOFFZELLEN-PROZESSGAS | [2003/44] | English: | FUEL CELLS WITH INTEGRATED HUMIDIFICATION AND METHOD FOR HUMIDIFYING FUEL CELL PROCESS GAS | [2003/44] | French: | PILES A COMBUSTIBLE COMPORTANT UNE HUMIDIFICATION INTEGREE ET PROCEDE D'HUMIDIFICATION DE GAZ DE PROCESSUS DE PILES A COMBUSTIBLE | [2003/44] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 05.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 21.07.2004 | IE | 21.07.2004 | TR | 21.07.2004 | DK | 21.10.2004 | GR | 21.10.2004 | ES | 01.11.2004 | PT | 21.12.2004 | CY | 30.01.2005 | LU | 30.01.2005 | BE | 31.01.2005 | MC | 31.01.2005 | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/20] | FI | 21.07.2004 | |
IE | 21.07.2004 | ||
TR | 21.07.2004 | ||
DK | 21.10.2004 | ||
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
ES | 01.11.2004 | ||
CY | 30.01.2005 | ||
LU | 30.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2007/11] | FI | 21.07.2004 | |
IE | 21.07.2004 | ||
TR | 21.07.2004 | ||
DK | 21.10.2004 | ||
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
ES | 01.11.2004 | ||
LU | 30.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 21.07.2004 | |
IE | 21.07.2004 | ||
TR | 21.07.2004 | ||
DK | 21.10.2004 | ||
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
ES | 01.11.2004 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 21.07.2004 | |
IE | 21.07.2004 | ||
DK | 21.10.2004 | ||
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
ES | 01.11.2004 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 21.07.2004 | |
IE | 21.07.2004 | ||
DK | 21.10.2004 | ||
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
ES | 01.11.2004 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 21.07.2004 | |
IE | 21.07.2004 | ||
DK | 21.10.2004 | ||
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
ES | 01.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 21.07.2004 | |
DK | 21.10.2004 | ||
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
ES | 01.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 21.07.2004 | |
DK | 21.10.2004 | ||
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 21.07.2004 | |
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 21.07.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2000260456 ; | [A]JP2000311699 ; | [A]JPH09180743 ; | [PA]JP2001196075 ; | [E]JP2002117881 ; | [A]DE19741331 (FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JUELICH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,9 * page 4, line 7 - page 5, line 1; figure 1 *; | [A]US6045934 (ENAMI YOSHIAKI [JP]) [A] 1,4,9 * figure 1; claims 1,2 *; | [A]DE19918850 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [A] 1,9 * figure 1; claims 1-4 *; | [A]DE19929472 (DORNIER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,9 * column 3, line 36 - line 60; figure 4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 12, & JP2000260456 A 20000922 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1,3,4,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010305), vol. 2000, no. 14, & JP2000311699 A 20001107 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 1997, no. 11, & JP09180743 A 19970711 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1,9 * abstract * | [PA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010511), vol. 2000, no. 24, & JP2001196075 A 20010719 (MATSUSHITA SEIKO CO LTD) [PA] 1,3,9 * abstract * | [E] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020805), vol. 2002, no. 08, & JP2002117881 A 20020419 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [E] 1,9 * abstract * |