EP1353882 - METHOD FOR RENDERING SURFACES RESISTANT TO SOILING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2003/43] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KELLER, Harald Dammstücker Weg 29 67069 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
JAHNS, Ekkehard Wintergasse 19/2 69469 Weinheim / DE | 03 /
LACH, Christian 45th floor, Jardine House No1 Connaught Pl.Central Hong Kong China / CN | 04 /
HÜFFER, Stephan Bauernwiesenstrasse 21 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | 05 /
STÖCKELMANN, Elmar Westring 54 67269 Grünstadt / DE | 06 /
THOMANN, Yi Im Brünnelacker 14 79224 Umkirch / DE | 07 /
FRECHEN, Thomas Dammweg 4/4 69123 Heidelberg / DE | [2003/50] |
Former [2003/43] | 01 /
KELLER, Harald Dammstücker Weg 29 67069 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
02 /
JAHNS, Ekkehard Wintergasse 19/2 69469 Weinheim / DE | |||
03 /
LACH, Christian Eduard-Jost-Str. 16 67098 Bad Dürkheim / DE | |||
04 /
HÜFFER, Stephan Bauernwiesenstrasse 21 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
05 /
STÖCKELMANN, Elmar Westring 54 67269 Grünstadt / DE | |||
06 /
THOMANN, Yi Im Brünnelacker 14 79224 Umkirch / DE | |||
07 /
FRECHEN, Thomas Dammweg 4/4 69123 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02702249.0 | 10.01.2002 | [2003/43] | WO2002EP00166 | Priority number, date | DE2001101162 | 12.01.2001 Original published format: DE 10101162 | [2003/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02055446 | Date: | 18.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1353882 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C03C17/00, C09D1/00 | [2003/43] | CPC: |
C09D1/00 (EP,US);
C03C17/007 (EP,US);
C03C2217/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SCHMUTZABWEISENDEN AUSRÜSTUNG VON OBERFLÄCHEN | [2003/43] | English: | METHOD FOR RENDERING SURFACES RESISTANT TO SOILING | [2003/43] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT ANTI-SALISSURE DE SURFACES | [2003/43] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/43] | 02.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/04] | 06.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0816466 (TOTO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,7-16 * claims 57,58,61-91,174 * * example - * [Y] 4,5; | [X]JPH11181339 ; | [DYA]WO9604123 (BARTHLOTT WILHELM [DE]) [DY] 4,5 * claim - * * example 1 * * page 4, paragraph 2 * [A] 1,7-16 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 37, Database accession no. 1999-439776, XP002197759 & JPH11181339 A 19990706 (TOTO LTD) [X] 1-3,7-16 * abstract * |