EP1366292 - DRY-RUNNING PISTON COMPRESSOR (CRANKSHAFT DRIVE LUBRICATION) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Schienenfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Schienenfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/49] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Schienenfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHNEIDER, Klaus-Michael Arnbacher Strasse 13 85229 Markt Indersdorf / DE | 02 /
HARTL, Michael Bürgermeister-Prenn-Str. 2a 82008 Unterhaching / DE | [2003/49] | Application number, filing date | 02702370.4 | 26.02.2002 | [2003/49] | WO2002EP02041 | Priority number, date | DE2001109514 | 28.02.2001 Original published format: DE 10109514 | [2003/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02068822 | Date: | 06.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1366292 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1366292 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F04B39/00, F04B39/02, F04B27/02 | [2003/49] | CPC: |
F16C7/023 (EP,US);
F04B25/00 (EP,US);
F04B27/02 (EP,US);
F04B39/0022 (EP,US);
F04B39/02 (EP,US);
F16C33/6625 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2185 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TROCKENLAUFENDER KOLBENVERDICHTER (KURBELTRIEBSCHMIERUNG) | [2003/49] | English: | DRY-RUNNING PISTON COMPRESSOR (CRANKSHAFT DRIVE LUBRICATION) | [2003/49] | French: | COMPRESSEUR A PISTON A FONCTIONNEMENT A SEC (LUBRIFICATION DE TRANSMISSION A VILEBREQUIN) | [2003/49] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.07.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/49] | 30.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.02.2009 | DK | 25.02.2009 | FI | 25.02.2009 | IE | 25.02.2009 | NL | 25.02.2009 | TR | 25.02.2009 | AT | 26.02.2009 | LU | 26.02.2009 | CH | 28.02.2009 | LI | 28.02.2009 | MC | 28.02.2009 | GB | 25.05.2009 | SE | 25.05.2009 | GR | 26.05.2009 | ES | 05.06.2009 | PT | 12.08.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | DK | 25.02.2009 | |
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
AT | 26.02.2009 | ||
LU | 26.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
GB | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | DK | 25.02.2009 | |
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
AT | 26.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
GB | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | DK | 25.02.2009 | |
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
AT | 26.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
GB | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | DK | 25.02.2009 | |
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
GB | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | DK | 25.02.2009 | |
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | DK | 25.02.2009 | |
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | DK | 25.02.2009 | |
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/42] | FI | 25.02.2009 | |
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | FI | 25.02.2009 | |
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | NL | 25.02.2009 | Cited in | International search | [YA]JP2000018235 ; | [PA]JP2001165047 ; | [A]US2005028 (EYNON JAMES H) [A] 1,2,4,5,7-10 * column 1, line 1 - line 9 * * page 1, column 1, line 42 - page 2, column 2, line 65 * * figure - *; | [XA]US2288596 (PIERCE JR THOMAS M) [X] 1,9 * page 2, column 1, line 68 - column 2, line 22 * * figure - * [A] 4,8; | [A]US2417197 (HEWITT ELLIS E, et al) [A] 1,5,8-10 * column 4, line 26 - line 46 * * figure 1 *; | [XAY]US5195420 (WANNER HANS [CH]) [X] 1-4,9 * abstract * * column 3, line 61 - column 6, line 50 * * figure - * [A] 10 [Y] 7,8 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000831), vol. 2000, no. 04, & JP2000018235 A 20000118 (AISIN SEIKI CO LTD) [Y] 7,8 * abstract * [A] 1,5 | [PA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010210), vol. 2000, no. 23, & JP2001165047 A 20010619 (ANEST IWATA CORP) [PA] 1-3,8-10 * abstract * |