EP1362148 - STRUCTURAL ELEMENT FOR APPLICATION OF PLASTER SUSPENDED CEILINGS ON FLOORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sacco, Pietro Via S. Matteo, 53 84090 Montecorvino Pugliano SA / IT | [2003/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/47] | Representative(s) | Celestino, Marco ABM Agenzia Brevetti & Marchi, Viale Giovanni Pisano, 31 56123 Pisa / IT | [2012/06] |
Former [2003/47] | Celestino, Marco ABM, Agenzia Brevetti & Marchi, Viale Giovanni Pisano, 31 56123 Pisa / IT | Application number, filing date | 02702585.7 | 18.02.2002 | [2003/47] | WO2002IB00481 | Priority number, date | EP20010830105 | 16.02.2001 Original published format: EP 01830105 | [2006/50] |
Former [2003/47] | EP18301051 | 16.02.2001 | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02066761 | Date: | 29.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1362148 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1362148 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E04C5/065, E04B1/41, E04B9/18 | [2003/47] | CPC: |
E04C5/0656 (EP);
E04B1/4171 (EP);
E04B9/18 (EP);
E04C3/29 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/47] | Title | German: | BAUELEMENT ZUM AUFHÄNGEN VON GIPSUNTERDECKEN AN DECKEN | [2003/47] | English: | STRUCTURAL ELEMENT FOR APPLICATION OF PLASTER SUSPENDED CEILINGS ON FLOORS | [2003/47] | French: | ELEMENT STRUCTURAL POUR APPLICATION DE PLAFONDS SUSPENDUS DE PLATRE SUR DES PLANCHERS | [2003/47] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2002 | Translation filed | 15.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/47] | 12.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   26.08.2008 | 28.02.2011 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   23.08.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.02.2012 | BE | 08.02.2012 | CY | 08.02.2012 | DK | 08.02.2012 | FI | 08.02.2012 | NL | 08.02.2012 | SE | 08.02.2012 | TR | 08.02.2012 | IE | 18.02.2012 | LU | 18.02.2012 | CH | 29.02.2012 | LI | 29.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | FR | 10.04.2012 | GB | 08.05.2012 | GR | 09.05.2012 | ES | 19.05.2012 | PT | 08.06.2012 | DE | 01.09.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
TR | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 18.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 10.04.2012 | ||
GB | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
DE | 01.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/30] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 18.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 10.04.2012 | ||
GB | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
DE | 01.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 18.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 10.04.2012 | ||
GB | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 18.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 10.04.2012 | ||
GB | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 18.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 10.04.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 18.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | NL | 08.02.2012 | |
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | NL | 08.02.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2319749 (HALFENEISEN GMBH CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,2,9 * the whole document *; | [XA]US4041664 (DAVIS JR GEORGE BRADLEY) [X] 1-4,6,9,10 * column 7, paragraph 2 - column 8, paragraph 2; figures 3-5 * [A] 5,7,8,11-16; | [XA]FR2534298 (JOANNES ANDRE [FR]) [X] 1 * page 2, line 13 - line 37; figure - * [A] 2,9,11; | [A]FR2580015 (SILIX CIE DAVUM DFC [FR]) [A] 1,2,9,11 * abstract *; | [A]EP0487422 (SARET FRANCE PPB S A [FR]) [A] 1,2* abstract * |