EP1375427 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A BARIUM SULFATE-BASED POWDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/01] | BARIUM SULFATE-BASED POWDERS AND COSMETICS CONTAINING THE SAME | ||
[2017/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.08.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHISEIDO COMPANY LIMITED 5-5 Ginza 7-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8010 / JP | [2017/52] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states SHISEIDO COMPANY LIMITED 5-5 Ginza 7-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYAMOTO, Tsuyoshi, @c/o Shiseido Research Center (Shin-Yokohama) 2-1 Hayabuchi 2-chome Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP | 02 /
OGAWA, Katsuki, @c/o Shiseido Research Center (Shin-Yokohama) 2-1 Hayabuchi 2-chome Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP | 03 /
TAKATA, Sadaki, @c/o Shiseido Research Center (Shin-Yokohama) 2-1 Hayabuchi 2-chome Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP | 04 /
DENDA, Mitsuhiro, @c/o Shiseido Research Center (Shin-Yokohama) 2-1 Hayabuchi 2-chome Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP | [2017/52] |
Former [2004/01] | 01 /
MIYAMOTO, Tsuyoshi, c/o Shiseido Research Center (Shin-Yokohama), 2-1 Hayabuchi 2-chome, Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP | ||
02 /
OGAWA, Katsuki, c/o Shiseido Research Center (Shin-Yokohama), 2-1 Hayabuchi 2-chome, Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP | |||
03 /
TAKATA, Sadaki, c/o Shiseido Research Center (Shin-Yokohama), 2-1 Hayabuchi 2-chome, Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP | |||
04 /
DENDA, Mitsuhiro, c/o Shiseido Research Center (Shin-Yokohama), 2-1 Hayabuchi 2-chome, Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/52] | Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/01] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02702799.4 | 07.03.2002 | [2004/01] | WO2002JP02122 | Priority number, date | JP20010064792 | 08.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001064792 | [2004/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02072475 | Date: | 19.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1375427 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1375427 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.09.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C01F11/46, A61K8/23, A61Q1/12, A61Q1/02 | [2009/41] | CPC: |
C01F11/462 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/23 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q1/02 (EP,US);
A61Q1/12 (EP,US);
C01D5/02 (KR);
C01F7/76 (KR);
C01G9/06 (KR);
C01P2004/01 (EP,US);
C01P2004/03 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/01] | C01F11/46, A61K7/00, A61K7/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2017/37] |
Former [2004/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AUF BARIUMSULFAT BASIERENDEM PULVER | [2017/35] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A BARIUM SULFATE-BASED POWDER | [2017/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN POUDRE A BASE DE SULFATE DE BARYUM | [2017/35] |
Former [2004/01] | AUF BARIUMSULFAT BASIERENDE PULVER UND DIESE ENTHALTENDE KOSMETIKA | ||
Former [2004/01] | BARIUM SULFATE-BASED POWDERS AND COSMETICS CONTAINING THE SAME | ||
Former [2004/01] | POUDRES A BASE DE SULFATE DE BARYUM ET PRODUITS COSMETIQUES LES CONTENANT | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2003 | Translation filed | 23.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2003 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 20.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 27.03.2018 | [2019/13] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB259102 (ANTON JAHL) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [X]US3653829 (GELBLUM GIDEON P) [X] 1-5 * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 12 *; | [X]US3655337 (POLINSKY SAMUEL M, et al) [X] 1-5 * claims 1-3 *; | [X]US5262148 (SUGASAWA HIROKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [X] - BLACK S N ET AL, "INTERACTIONS AT THE ORGANIC/INORGANIC INTERFACE: BINDING MOTIFS FOR PHOSPHONATES AT THE SURFACE OF BARITE CRYSTALS", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY. FARADAY TRANSACTIONS, ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (19911021), vol. 87, no. 20, ISSN 0956-5000, pages 3409 - 3414, XP000232558 [X] 1-5 * page 3409 - page 3410 * * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/ft9918703409 | [X] - FRANCESC TORRADES, JOSEP GARCÍA RAURICH, "Study of the coprecipitation of calcium, potassium, sodium and chloride with barium sulfate using atomic spectrometry and visible spectrophotometry", ANALYST, Royal Society of Chemistry, UK, (199302), vol. 118, pages 197 - 200, XP009121724 [X] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/AN9931800197 | International search | [X]JPS309315B ; | [X]JPS5033984B ; | [X]JPS5033985B ; | [X]JPS4880498 ; | [X]JPS5220660 (SEISAN KAIHATSU KAGAKU KENKYUS); | [X]JPH0388715 (SAKAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO); | [X]JPH0558624 (KAO CORP); | [X]JPH07277729 (KAO CORP); | [A]JPH1135319 (DOWA MINING CO) |